EP2291474 - DECORATIVE COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF USING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knauf Gips KG Am Bahnhof 7 97346 Iphofen / DE | [2014/14] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states United States Gypsum Company 550 West Adams Street Chicago, IL 60661-3676 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURY, Rafael 1226 Sarasota Drive Wheeling IL 60090 / US | 02 /
LI, Donghong 415 Chateau Drive Buffalo Groe IL 60089 / US | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2016/49] |
Former [2013/35] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2011/42] | Schütte, Hartmut, et al BSB Anwaltskanzlei Am Markt 2 Eingang Herrenstraße 59302 Oelde / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Pontet, Bernard Pontet Allano & Associés 25, Rue Jean Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université 91893 Orsay Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09759147.3 | 01.06.2009 | [2011/10] | WO2009US45780 | Priority number, date | US20080132204 | 03.06.2008 Original published format: US 132204 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009148986 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2291474 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2291474 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C04B26/02, C08L33/08, C08L35/06 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
C08L33/08 (EP,US);
C04B26/02 (EP,US);
C08L35/00 (EP,US);
C08L35/06 (EP,US);
C09D133/08 (EP,US);
C09D135/06 (EP,US);
C04B2111/1037 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B26/02, C04B14/28, C04B2103/44, C04B2103/67 (EP,US);
C08L33/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L35/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/46] | C04B26/02, C08L33/08 | ||
Former IPC [2011/10] | C09D201/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/49] |
Former [2011/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DEKORATIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2011/10] | English: | DECORATIVE COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF USING IT | [2011/10] | French: | COMPOSITION DÉCORATIVE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2011/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 30.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | IT | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MK | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | BG | 07.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | CZ | 01.06.2017 | IE | 01.06.2017 | MT | 01.06.2017 | SK | 01.06.2017 | HU | 02.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 01.06.2017 | ||
MT | 01.06.2017 | ||
SK | 01.06.2017 | ||
HU | 02.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 01.06.2017 | ||
MT | 01.06.2017 | ||
SK | 01.06.2017 | ||
HU | 02.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 01.06.2017 | ||
MT | 01.06.2017 | ||
SK | 01.06.2017 | ||
HU | 02.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 01.06.2017 | ||
SK | 01.06.2017 | ||
HU | 02.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | HR | 07.12.2016 | |
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5434009 (URBANEK THOMAS W [CA]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5741844 (NASS WARREN JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2005139126 (KHAN AMIR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2006159908 (HOUCK MERLE [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15 * page 3; table - * [I] 7 | International search | [Y]EP0765365 (SURFACE COATINGS INTERNATIONAL [GB]); | [X]US2002129744 (IMMORDINO SALVATORE C [US], et al); | [A]US2004010071 (GEBHART MATTHEW STEWART [US], et al); | [A]KR20070005639 (DU PONT [US]) |