EP2364218 - CONTAINER FOR THE ISOLATION AND IDENTIFICATION OF MICROORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/37] | SEPARATION DEVICE FOR USE IN THE SEPARATION, CHARACTERIZATION AND/OR IDENTIFICATION OF MICROORGANISMS | ||
[2019/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states bioMérieux, Inc. 100 Rodolphe Street Durham, NC 27712 / US | [2020/19] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Biomerieux, Inc 100 Rodolphe Street Durham, NC 27712 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALSH, John 704 Wellingham Drive Durham NC 27713 / US | 02 /
HYMAN, Jones 2501 Dunmore Court Wake Forest NC 27587 / US | 03 /
RONSICK, Christopher 2817 Duke Homestead Road Durham NC 27712 / US | 04 /
LINK, John 4819 Northbury Circle Durham NC 27712 / US | 05 /
ROBINSON, Ron 4404 Dula Street Durham NC 27705 / US | 06 /
WILSON, Mark 6814 Carol Lane Hillsborough NC 27278 / US | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2011/37] | Marchant, Michael John Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09760034.0 | 30.10.2009 | [2020/16] | WO2009US05888 | Priority number, date | US20080110187P | 31.10.2008 Original published format: US 110187 P | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010062353 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2364218 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2364218 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03, G01N21/35, G01N21/3581, G01N21/359, G01N21/47, G01N21/64, G01N21/65, C12Q1/04, G01N33/68 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
G01N21/65 (EP,US);
C12M1/24 (KR);
C12Q1/24 (US);
B01L3/50 (KR);
B01L3/5021 (US);
C12M1/00 (KR);
C12M1/34 (KR);
C12Q1/04 (EP,US);
C12Q1/37 (US);
C12Q1/6816 (US);
G01N21/03 (EP,US);
G01N33/6848 (EP,US);
B01L2300/042 (US);
B01L2300/0838 (US);
B01L2300/0861 (US);
G01N21/35 (EP,US);
G01N21/3581 (EP,US);
G01N21/359 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/37] | B01L3/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER ZUR ISOLIERUNG UND IDENTIFIKATION VON MIKROORGANISMEN | [2019/45] | English: | CONTAINER FOR THE ISOLATION AND IDENTIFICATION OF MICROORGANISMS | [2019/45] | French: | RECIPIENT POUR L'ISOLATION ET L'IDENTIFICATION DE MICRO-ORGANISMES | [2019/45] |
Former [2011/37] | TRENNVORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER TRENNUNG, CHARAKTERISIERUNG UND/ODER IDENTIFIKATION VON MIKROORGANISMEN | ||
Former [2011/37] | SEPARATION DEVICE FOR USE IN THE SEPARATION, CHARACTERIZATION AND/OR IDENTIFICATION OF MICROORGANISMS | ||
Former [2011/37] | DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION UTILE POUR LA SÉPARATION, LA CARACTÉRISATION ET/OU L'IDENTIFICATION DE MICRO-ORGANISMES | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 04.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.10.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2009 | AT | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | DK | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | ES | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | HR | 15.04.2020 | IT | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | MK | 15.04.2020 | MT | 15.04.2020 | NL | 15.04.2020 | PL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | SM | 15.04.2020 | TR | 15.04.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | NO | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | IS | 15.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | IE | 30.10.2020 | LU | 30.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.10.2009 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 15.04.2020 | |
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4007639 (HAECKEL RAINER); | [XI]US4021352 (SARSTEDT WALTER); | [XI]US4687479 (SARSTEDT WALTER [DE], et al); | [XI]US5242660 (HSEI PAUL [US]); | [XI]US5257984 (KELLEY THOMAS F [US]); | [XI]US5456885 (COLEMAN CHARLES M [US], et al); | [XI]EP0901821 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | [XI]WO02068580 (BIO MERIEUX INC [US], et al); | [XI]EP1346773 (LEISURE INC [JP]); | [XI]WO2004043601 (DIASYS CORP [US], et al) | Examination | US4212948 | US5736398 | WO0221108 | by applicant | US4687479 | WO02068580 | US20090589929 | US20090589952 | US20090589936 | US20090589976 |