EP2379539 - AMINO ACID ESTER PRODRUGS AND THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIBOM, Daniel Dönhoffstr. 80 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
LERCHEN, Hans-Georg Sürderstr. 3 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
VAKALOPOULOS, Alexandros Heinrich-Heine-Str. 79a 40721 Hilden / DE | 04 /
ALBRECHT-KÜPPER, Barbara Heidestr. 9 42289 Wülfrath / DE | 05 /
NELL, Peter Briller Höhe 12 42115 Wuppertal / DE | 06 /
KELDENICH, Jörg Damaschkeweg 49 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 07 /
ZIMMERMANN, Katja Bockumer Str. 370 B 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | 08 /
KRENZ, Ursula Am Kloster 33 42799 Leichlingen / DE | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/43] | Application number, filing date | 09760499.5 | 03.12.2009 | WO2009EP08618 | Priority number, date | DE20081062566 | 16.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008062566 | [2011/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010072315 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2379539 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/12, A61K31/4439 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AMINOSÄUREESTER-PRODRUGS UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2011/43] | English: | AMINO ACID ESTER PRODRUGS AND THE USE THEREOF | [2011/43] | French: | PROMÉDICAMENTS D'ESTERS D'ACIDES AMINÉS ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2011/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 26.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0125210 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03053441 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 50 - page 54; claims 1-11 * * page 6, line 16 - line 20 *; | [YDP]WO2009015776 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [YDP] 1-13 * page 193 - page 199; claims 1-13 * * page 135 - page 137; examples 48,49 * * page 141 - page 142; examples 58,60 * * page 7, line 8 - line 11 *; | [YP]WO2009015812 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [YP] 1-13* the whole document *; | [AD] - BEAUMONT K ET AL, "DESIGN OF ESTER PRODRUGS TO ENHANCE ORAL ABSORPTION OF POORLY PERMEABLE COMPOUNDS: CHALLENGES TO THE DISCOVERY SCIENTIST", CURRENT DRUG METABOLISM, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, US, (20030101), vol. 4, no. 6, ISSN 1389-2002, pages 461 - 485, XP008058352 [AD] 1 * das ganze Dokument; im besonderen, Seite 469, Tabelle 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1389200033489253 |