EP2370443 - DIHYDROETORPHINES AND THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Euro-Celtique S.A. 2, avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITELOCK, Steve Mundipharma Research Limited 191 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB | 02 /
HARDING, Deborah Phyllis Mundipharma Research Limited 191 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB | 03 /
TURNER, Carl David Colour Synthesis Solutions Ltd Hexagon House Delaunays Road Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Gordon, Kirsteen Helen Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Gordon, Kirsteen Helen Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09760972.1 | 04.12.2009 | WO2009GB51655 | Priority number, date | GB20080022342 | 08.12.2008 Original published format: GB 0822342 | GB20090020699 | 26.11.2009 Original published format: GB 0920699 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010067101 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2370443 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2370443 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D489/12, A61K31/4353, A61P29/00 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
C07D489/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D489/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/7023 (US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07D489/10 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Extension states | AL | 29.06.2011 | BA | 29.06.2011 | RS | 29.06.2011 | Title | German: | DIHYDROETORPHINE UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [2011/40] | English: | DIHYDROETORPHINES AND THEIR PREPARATION | [2011/40] | French: | DIHYDROÉTORPHINE ET LEURS PREPARATIONS | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 14.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15177476.7 / EP3018133 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US5849915 (KIM YONG HAE [KR], et al) [I] 1-25 * column 3 *; | [I] - PARK H S ET AL, "A highly selective kappa-opioid receptor agonist with low addictive potential and dependence liability", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.BMCL.2006.02.017, vol. 16, no. 13, ISSN 0960-894X, (20060701), pages 3609 - 3613, (20060502), XP002561404 [I] 1-25 * page 3610; compounds 1,2,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2006.02.017 | [X] - BENTLEY, KENNETH W. ET AL, "Novel analgesics and molecular rearrangements in the morphine-thebaine group. I.. Ketones derived from 6,14-endo-ethenotetrahydrothebaine", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY , 89(13), 3267-73 CODEN: JACSAT; ISSN: 0002-7863, (1967), XP002578360 [X] 2,4,18,19 * page 3270 - page 3272 * | [X] - BENTLEY, KENNETH W. ET AL, Novel analgesics and molecular rearrangements in the morphine-thebaine group. II. Alcohols derived from 6,14-endo-etheno- and 6,14-endo-ethanotetrahydrothebaine, JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY , 89(13), 3273-80 CODEN: JACSAT; ISSN: 0002-7863, (1967), XP002578361 [X] 3 * page 3280 * | [X] - MARTON J ET AL, "HERSTELLUNG VON 6,14-ETHENOMORPHINAN-DERIVATEN", MONATSHEFTE FUR CHEMIE, SPRINGER VERLAG WIEN, AT, (19940101), vol. 125, no. 11, ISSN 0026-9247, pages 1229 - 1240, XP002560363 [X] 15 * page 1231; compound 3q * | [X] - COOP, ANDREW ET AL, "Methylation of the enolates of thevinone and some analogs", TETRAHEDRON , 51(35), 9681-98 CODEN: TETRAB; ISSN: 0040-4020, (1995), XP002578362 [X] 17 * page 9685; compound 25 * |