EP2293721 - MEDICAL X-RAY EXAMINATION APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR K-EDGE IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROKSA, Roland c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/11] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09760981.2 | 17.06.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009IB52562 | Priority number, date | EP20080158745 | 23.06.2008 Original published format: EP 08158745 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009156898 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2293721 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2293721 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03, A61B6/00, G21K1/06 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
A61B6/4035 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/4014 (EP,US);
A61B6/4042 (EP,US);
A61B6/4241 (EP,US);
A61B6/481 (EP,US);
A61B6/482 (EP,US);
A61B6/504 (EP,US);
A61B6/583 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES RÖNTGENGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR K-EDGE-DARSTELLUNG | [2011/11] | English: | MEDICAL X-RAY EXAMINATION APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR K-EDGE IMAGING | [2011/11] | French: | APPAREIL D'EXAMEN MEDICAL AUX RAYONX X ET PROCEDE D'IMAGERIE A SEUIL K | [2011/25] |
Former [2011/11] | APPAREIL D'EXAMEN MÉDICAL AUX RAYONX X ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE À SEUIL K | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 01.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2009 | AT | 09.11.2011 | BE | 09.11.2011 | CY | 09.11.2011 | CZ | 09.11.2011 | DK | 09.11.2011 | EE | 09.11.2011 | FI | 09.11.2011 | HR | 09.11.2011 | IT | 09.11.2011 | LT | 09.11.2011 | LV | 09.11.2011 | MK | 09.11.2011 | MT | 09.11.2011 | NL | 09.11.2011 | PL | 09.11.2011 | RO | 09.11.2011 | SE | 09.11.2011 | SI | 09.11.2011 | SK | 09.11.2011 | TR | 09.11.2011 | BG | 09.02.2012 | NO | 09.02.2012 | GR | 10.02.2012 | ES | 20.02.2012 | IS | 09.03.2012 | PT | 09.03.2012 | IE | 17.06.2012 | LU | 17.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | FR | 02.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
LU | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NO | 09.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4736398 (GRAEFF WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US6038285 (ZHONG ZHONG [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [YP]DE102007017789 (WALENTA ALBERT H [DE]) [YP] 10 * the whole document *; | [YA] - ZHONG Z; CHAPMAN D; MENK R; RICHARDSON J; THEOPHANIS S; THOMLINSON W, "Monochromatic energy-subtraction radiography using a rotating anode source and a bent Laue monochromator", PHYS. MED. BIOL., (1997), vol. 42, doi:10.1088/0031-9155/42/9/007, pages 1751 - 1762, XP002567262 [Y] 10 * the whole document * [A] 1-9,11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/42/9/007 | [A] - ZHONG Z; LE DUC G; CHAPMAN D; THOMLINSON W, "A tunable Laue/bent-Laue monochromator with fixed second crystal for synchrotron radiation", AIP CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, (1997), no. 417, ISSN 0094-243X, pages 95 - 100, XP002567263 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - FREUDENBERGER J ET AL, "Perspectives of medical X-ray imaging", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - A:ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010621), vol. 466, no. 1, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 99 - 104, XP004251282 [A] 1-13 * page 101, column right, lines 17-19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9002(01)00831-2 | [A] - SUORTTI P; THOMLINSON W; CHAPMAN D; GMUR N; GREENE R; LAZARZ N, "Performance evaluation of a bent Laue monochromator", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION A (ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT), (19901115), vol. A297, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 268 - 274, XP002567271 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-9002(90)91375-L | by applicant | - Z. ZHONG ET AL., "Monochromatic energy-subtraction radiography using a rotating anode source and a bent Laue monochromator", PHYS.MED.BIOL., (1997), vol. 42, doi:doi:10.1088/0031-9155/42/9/007, pages 1751 - 1762, XP002567262 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/42/9/007 | - Z. ZHONG ET AL., "A tunable Laue/Bent-Laue monochromator with fixed second crystal for synchrotron radiation", AIP CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, (1997), pages 95 - 100, XP002567263 |