EP2299881 - DEVICE FOR WHISKING MILK AND METHOD FOR CLEANING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOUMA, Sipke, T. c/o Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
QUAH, Peng, C. c/o Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/36] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
DOUMA, Sipke, T. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
QUAH, Peng, C. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/13] | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09762143.7 | 10.06.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009IB52464 | Priority number, date | EP20080158186 | 13.06.2008 Original published format: EP 08158186 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009150616 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299881 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2299881 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44, A47J31/60 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
A47J31/4485 (EP,US);
A47J31/44 (KR);
A47J31/60 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM QUIRLEN VON MILCH UND VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2011/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR WHISKING MILK AND METHOD FOR CLEANING SUCH A DEVICE | [2011/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR FOUETTER LE LAIT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 04.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2009 | AT | 07.09.2011 | BE | 07.09.2011 | CY | 07.09.2011 | CZ | 07.09.2011 | DK | 07.09.2011 | EE | 07.09.2011 | FI | 07.09.2011 | HR | 07.09.2011 | LT | 07.09.2011 | LV | 07.09.2011 | MK | 07.09.2011 | MT | 07.09.2011 | NL | 07.09.2011 | PL | 07.09.2011 | RO | 07.09.2011 | SE | 07.09.2011 | SI | 07.09.2011 | SK | 07.09.2011 | BG | 07.12.2011 | NO | 07.12.2011 | GR | 08.12.2011 | IS | 07.01.2012 | PT | 09.01.2012 | IE | 10.06.2012 | LU | 10.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MK | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.06.2012 | ||
LU | 10.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MK | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004058020 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1,7 * page 16, lines 18-32 * * page 17, line 4 - page 19, line 22 ** figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US2005233043 (DIRREN FRANCOIS [CH]) [DA] 1,4,6-8,12,13 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] - [0019] , [0020] , [0022] , [0023]; figure 1 * |