EP2307338 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR OLEFIN RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Evonik Oxeno GmbH Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1 45772 Marl / DE | ||
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Trans Ionics Corporation 2408 Timberloch Place Suite D-5 The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUCKER, Robert, C. 2408 Timberloch Place The Woodlands TX 77380 / US | 02 /
LYNCH, Michael, F. 2100 Tanglewilde Ave. 25 Houston TX 77063 / US | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Camenisch, Andrew Richard HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Camenisch, Andrew Richard Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2011/15] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09763366.3 | 08.06.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009US46559 | Priority number, date | US20080060056P | 09.06.2008 Original published format: US 60056 P | US20080060045P | 09.06.2008 Original published format: US 60045 P | US20080060052P | 09.06.2008 Original published format: US 60052 P | US20080060044P | 09.06.2008 Original published format: US 60044 P | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009152075 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2307338 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C7/152, C07C7/156, C10G70/00 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
C07C7/152 (EP,US);
C07C7/156 (EP,US);
C10G70/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/15] | C07C7/144 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR OLEFINRÜCKGEWINNUNG | [2011/15] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR OLEFIN RECOVERY | [2011/15] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉCUPÉRATION D OLÉFINES | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 19.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 04.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 11.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2011 | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 31.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4132744 (KNIFTON JOHN F) [Y] 6,12-36 * abstract * * column 2, line 52 - line 68 * * column 3, line 1 - line 12 * * claims 1-10 *; | [Y]WO0198239 (CHEVRON USA INC [US]) [Y] 21-22 * abstract * * page 20; table 4 * * claims 1-34 *; | [XP]US2009143632 (ASARO MARIANNA F [US]) [XP] 1-4,7-12,27,29-32 * abstract * * claims 1-30 ** paragraphs [0023] , [0029] , [0033] *; | [X] - NAIDU A B ET AL, "An efficient intermolecular BINAM-copper(I) catalyzed Ullmann-type coupling of aryl iodides/bromides with aliphatic alcohols", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 49, no. 19, ISSN 0040-4039, (20080505), pages 3147 - 3151, (20080308), XP022594850 [X] 1-5,7-10 * entry 10; page 3148, column r; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2008.03.015 | [X] - MARKO SABAN ET AL., "Copper(I)-Mediated Ligand-Accelerated Ullmann-Type Coupling of Anilines with Aryliodides: Ligand Selection and Reaction Kinetics for Synthesis of Tri-p-Tolylamine", INDUSTRIAL & ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, (20050216), vol. 44, no. 4, XP002560962 [X] 1-5,7-11 * Scheme 1; page 790 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/IE0493513 | [Y] - HIDEFUMI HIRAI, KAZUNORI KURIMA AND MAKOTO KOMIYAMA, "ETHYLENE ABSORPTION BY SOLUTIONS OF COPPER(I) CHLORIDE AND AMINES IN METHANOL", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (19860505), vol. 15, no. 5, XP002560963 [Y] 6,12-36 * abstract * * tables 1-2 * * page 674, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - JEFFERY S. THOMPSON, JOHN F. WHITNEY, "Copper(I) complexes with unsaturated small molecules. Preparation and structural characterization of copper(I)-di-2-pyridylamine complexes with olefins, acetylene, and carbon monoxide", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (198608), vol. 23, no. 18, XP002560964 [Y] 6,12-36 * page 2813, column r, line 2 - line 4 * * page 2814, column r, paragraph 3 - page 2815, column l, paragraph 2 * * equations 1-3; page 2816, column l * * page 2817; figures 1-2 * * page 2819, column r, paragraph 1 * | by applicant | US4132744 |