EP2313019 - A SYSTEM FOR TRACKING THE LOCATION OF COMPONENTS, ASSEMBLIES, AND SUB-ASSEMBLIES IN A MEDICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRITCHIE, Patrick, P. 218 Westwood Drive Southlake TX 76092 / US | 02 /
SCHWARTZ, Oscar, F. 1007 Cristopher Court Arlington TX 76015 / US | 03 /
LOPEZ, Renee, A. 2326 Dartmouth Drive Grand Prairie TX 75052 / US | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09763431.5 | 09.06.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009US46723 | Priority number, date | US20080137638 | 12.06.2008 Original published format: US 137638 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009152140 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2313019 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, G06K17/00, G06F19/00 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
A61B90/98 (EP,US);
A61B90/90 (EP,US);
G16H40/40 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0811 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERFOLGUNG DER LOKALISATION VON KOMPONENTEN, ANORDNUNGEN UND BAUTEILEN IN EINEM MEDIZINISCHEN INSTRUMENT | [2011/17] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR TRACKING THE LOCATION OF COMPONENTS, ASSEMBLIES, AND SUB-ASSEMBLIES IN A MEDICAL INSTRUMENT | [2011/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DESTINÉ À SUIVRE L EMPLACEMENT DE COMPOSANTS, ENSEMBLES, ET SOUS-ENSEMBLES DANS UN INSTRUMENT MÉDICAL | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 05.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 06.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008030345 (AUSTIN GENE E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-31 * paragraphs [0055] - [0060] - [0111] , [0112] , [0117] , [0126] , [0138] , [0169] - [0174] - [0197] - [0201] * * paragraphs [0206] - [0214] - [0232] - [0234] - [0237] - [0242] - [0247] * * figures 3,11,13,21-29,41 *; | [XI]DE102005028476 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-12,14-24,26-31 * paragraphs [0008] - [0014] - [0018] , [0025] - [0027] - [0036] - [0039] - [0045] - [0049] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 6; | [XI]US2007018810 (SMYTHE ALAN H [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-24,26-31 * paragraphs [0014] - [0020] - [0031] - [0033] - [0040] , [0041] , [0043] - [0046] * * figure 3 * [I] 6 |