EP2297332 - METHODS AND PLATFORMS FOR DRUG DISCOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Izumi Bio, Inc. 951 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKURADA, Kazuhiro 9-16 Misuzugaoka Aobaku Yokohama, 225-0016 / JP | 02 /
SEIDENMAN, Kenneth, J. 13933 Gunnison Court San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/18] | Polz, Leo Hoffmann Eitle Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | Wilkinson, Marc George, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09763772.2 | 12.06.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009US47291 | Priority number, date | US20080061592P | 13.06.2008 Original published format: US 61592 P | US20080061594P | 13.06.2008 Original published format: US 61594 P | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009152484 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2297332 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/02, G01N33/15 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
G01N33/5073 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/12] | C12Q1/02, C12N5/08, G01N33/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND PLATTFORMEN ZUR ARZNEISTOFFENTDECKUNG | [2011/12] | English: | METHODS AND PLATFORMS FOR DRUG DISCOVERY | [2011/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET PLATEFORMES POUR LA DÉCOUVERTE DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 23.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/09] | 17.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2009061442 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]; PARK IN-HYUN [US]; DALEY GEORGE Q [US];) [XP] 1-15 * page 60, line 9 - line 24 *; | [X]US2006222636 (RAMBUKKANA ANURA [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0304]; claim 1 * | [A] - MALI PRASHANT ET AL, "Improved efficiency and pace of generating induced pluripotent stem cells from human adult and fetal fibroblasts", STEM CELLS (MIAMISBURG), (20080529), vol. 26, no. 8, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 1998 - 2005, XP002668773 [A] 1-15 * page 2002, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/STEMCELLS.2008-0346 | [XP] - EBERT ALLISON D ET AL, "Induced pluripotent stem cells from a spinal muscular atrophy patient", NATURE 15 JAN 2009,, (20090115), vol. 457, no. 7227, doi:10.1038/NATURE07677, pages 277 - 280, XP002552498 [XP] 1-15 * column l, paragraph l; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature07677 | International search | [A]US6365352 (SUBRAHMANYAM V. YERRAMILLI ET AL.); | [A]US2004048297 (UWE SCHERF) | [X] - W.E. LOWRY ET AL., "Generation of human induced pluripotent stem cells from dermal fibroblasts", PNAS, (20080226), vol. 105, no. 8, pages 2883 - 2888, XP002555951 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0711983105 | [A] - KAZUTOSHI TAKAHASHI ET AL., "Induction of Pluripotent Stem Cells from Adult Human Fibroblasts by Defined Factors", CELL, (20071130), vol. 131, pages 1 - 12, XP002555952 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2007.11.019 |