EP2293849 - ORAL COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT, Pierre Rue Mat Pays 4 B-4621 Fleron / BE | 02 /
BLANVALET, Claude Rue Bossy 61 B-4031 Liege / BE | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2011/11] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09763794.6 | 15.06.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009US47383 | Priority number, date | US20080138647 | 13.06.2008 Original published format: US 138647 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009152507 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2293849 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2293849 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q11/00, A61K8/03, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/92 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
A61K8/03 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/06 (CN);
A61K8/21 (CN);
A61K8/92 (CN);
A61P1/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2011/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORALE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND IHRE ANWENDUNGEN | [2011/11] | English: | ORAL COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF | [2011/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS À USAGE ORAL ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 02.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2009 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | IE | 15.06.2017 | LU | 15.06.2017 | MT | 15.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.06.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 15.06.2017 | ||
MT | 15.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.06.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 15.06.2017 | ||
MT | 15.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.06.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 15.06.2017 | ||
MT | 15.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 15.06.2017 | ||
MT | 15.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 15.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 15.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1797860 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,11,15,16,18-22 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0010] - [0012] * * paragraph [0015] * * examples 1-7 * * claims 1,4,5 * [I] 9,10,12; | [XI]EP1561454 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,11,15,16,18-22 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0009] - [0011] * * paragraph [0014] * * examples 1-7 * * claims 1,4,5 * [I] 9,10,12; | [XD]US6465521 (ROSENBERG MELVYN [IL]) [XD] 1-3,6-8,11,18-22 * column 1, line 14 - line 37 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 14 * * Sample number 5;; table 4 *; | [X]US2002054859 (ALVAREZ HERNANDEZ MARIA [ES]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,13,14,21,22 * example 5 *; | [A]GB2219937 (UNIV RAMOT [IL]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]AT377436B (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-22 * examples 1,2 *; | [AD]US4525342 (WEISS ERVIN [IL], et al) [AD] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002068074 (GANDINI LUCIANA [BR], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]GB641203 (UNILEVER LTD) [A] 1-22 * the whole document * * page 2, line 54 - line 61 * | by applicant | US4525342 | US6465521 | EP1797860 | EP1561454 | US2002054859 |