EP2362927 - DISCONNECT DEVICE FOR DOWNHOLE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligent Drilling Tools Limited Greasbrough Road Rotherham, South Yorkshire S60 1RW / GB | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLLERENSHAW, Andy 13 Dunkerley Road Sheffield South Yorkshire S6 6RB / GB | 02 /
HUNTER, Gordon 4 Halley's Court Kirkcaldy Fife KY1 1NZ / GB | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2011/36] | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09764563.4 | 30.11.2009 | [2016/47] | WO2009GB51622 | Priority number, date | GB20080021744 | 28.11.2008 Original published format: GB 0821744 | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010061231 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2362927 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2362927 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/06 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
E21B17/06 (EP,GB,US);
E21B17/02 (GB);
E21B17/04 (GB);
E21B19/16 (GB);
E21B19/18 (GB);
E21B23/04 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRENNVORRICHTUNG FÜR BOHRLOCHANORDNUNG | [2014/51] | English: | DISCONNECT DEVICE FOR DOWNHOLE ASSEMBLY | [2011/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉCONNEXION POUR ENSEMBLE D EXTRACTION | [2011/36] |
Former [2011/36] | TRENNVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BOHRLOCHANORDNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 20.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 06.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2009 | AT | 23.11.2016 | BE | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | ES | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | IS | 23.11.2016 | IT | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | MK | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | SM | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | IE | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | MT | 30.11.2016 | FR | 23.01.2017 | BG | 23.02.2017 | GB | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.11.2009 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IS | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 23.01.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.11.2009 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 23.01.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.11.2009 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 23.01.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 23.01.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 23.01.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9958809 (PETROLEUM ENG SERVICES [US], et al); | [A]WO0161143 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]); | [XAI]US2002185315 (MCLOUGHLIN STEPHEN JOHN [GB], et al); | [A]WO03048501 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) |