EP2370724 - DEVICE FOR CENTERING ADJACENT PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecmission B.V. Kanaaldijk 142a 1831 BA Koedijk / NL | [2016/27] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states Selmers Holding B.V. Biesland 3 1948 RJ Beverwijk / NL | ||
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Duin, Erik Nicolaas Kanaaldijk 142a 1831 BA Koedijk / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duin, Eric Nicolaas Kanaaldijk 142a 1831 BA Koedijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | 01 /
Duin, Erik Nicolaas Kanaaldijk 142a 1831 BA Koedijk / NL | ||
Former [2011/40] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2012/20] |
Former [2011/40] | Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf Indeig B.V. Bloemendaalseweg 277A, P.O. Box 3 2050 AA Overveen / NL | Application number, filing date | 09764614.5 | 26.11.2009 | WO2009NL50720 | Priority number, date | NL20081036246 | 26.11.2008 Original published format: NL 1036246 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010062177 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2370724 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/12, F16B7/04, B25B5/14 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
F16L37/1235 (EP);
B25B5/147 (EP);
F16B7/0413 (EP);
F16L1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZENTRIEREN BENACHBARTER ROHRE | [2011/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR CENTERING ADJACENT PIPES | [2011/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR CENTRER DES TUYAUX ADJACENTS | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 09.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 25.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2016 | 30.11.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US6119916 (ANDERSON CLIFFORD J [CA], et al) [X] 1-2,7-8 * column 1, line 1 - line 8 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 34 * * column 9, line 21 - line 67 * * column 11, line 10 - column 12, line 29 * * column 16, line 50 - column 19, line 39 * * column 20, lines 10-17,36-44 * * column 21, line 38 - column 22, line 54 * * column 25, line 44 - column 26, line 4 * * figure - * [Y] 3-6 [I] 9-11; | [AD]DE4207375 (HOESCH AG [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]DE9418958U (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [YA]US3979041 (KANEYAMA KIYOSHI, et al) [Y] 3-6 * column 4, line 52 - line 56 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 2 * * claim 1 * * figure - * [A] 1 | by applicant | US6119916 | US3979041 |