EP2370285 - HYBRID DRIVE UNIT AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Getrag Getriebe Und Zahnradfabrik Hermann Hagenmeyer GmbH & Cie. KG Hermann-Hagenmeyer-Strasse 1 74199 Untergruppenbach / DE | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Getrag Driveline Systems GmbH Scarletallee 2 50735 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NETT, Hans-Peter Zum Eckernbaum 14 53518 Adenau / DE | 02 /
STEINBERG, Ingo Graf-von-Looz-Str. 4 50769 Köln / DE | 03 /
KATHER, Lutz Mönchhofweg 6 53909 Zülpich / DE | 04 /
BRINGS, Wolfgang Herzog-Johann-Str. 38 50769 Köln / DE | 05 /
GÖTTERT, Christoph Neusser Strasse 89 50670 Köln / DE | 06 /
GRAVE, Christoph Paul-Rauscher-Strasse 5 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | 07 /
HAUPT, Jan Lerbacher Weg 14a 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 08 /
ULLMANN, David Grüner Platz 7 08289 Schneeberg / DE | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/40] | 01 /
NETT, Hans-Peter Zum Eckernbaum 14 53518 Adenau / DE | ||
02 /
STEINBERG, Ingo Graf-von-Looz-Str. 4 50769 Köln / DE | |||
03 /
KATHER, Lutz Mönchhofweg 6 53909 Zülpich / DE | |||
04 /
BRINGS, Wolfgang Herzog-Johann-Str. 38 50769 Köln / DE | |||
05 /
GÖTTERT, Christoph Neusser Strasse 89 50670 Köln / DE | |||
06 /
GRAVE, Christoph Paul-Rauscher-Strasse 5 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
07 /
HAUPT, Jan Lerbacher Weg 14a 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
08 /
ULLMANN, David Königswinterstr. 24 50939 Köln / DE | Representative(s) | Tersteegen, Felix, et al Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 6A 50670 Köln / DE | [2015/04] |
Former [2011/40] | Tersteegen, Felix Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Straße 161a 50933 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 09764793.7 | 01.12.2009 | WO2009EP66174 | Priority number, date | DE20081037618 | 01.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008037618 | DE20091043966 | 09.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009043966 | [2011/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010063735 | Date: | 10.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2370285 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2370285 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/365, B60K6/442, B60K6/547, F16H57/02, F16H57/04, F16H61/00 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
B60W20/00 (EP,US);
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/442 (EP,US);
B60K6/547 (EP,US);
B60L50/62 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (EP,US);
F16H61/0031 (EP,US);
B60K1/02 (EP,US);
B60W2510/244 (US);
F16H2061/0037 (EP,US);
F16H3/54 (EP,US);
F16H57/0439 (EP,US);
F16H57/0446 (EP,US);
F16H57/0479 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRID-ANTRIEBSEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETRIEB | [2011/40] | English: | HYBRID DRIVE UNIT AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF | [2011/40] | French: | UNITE D'ENTRAINEMENT HYBRIDE ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2014/33] |
Former [2011/40] | UNITÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT HYBRIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 30.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2009 | CY | 21.01.2015 | CZ | 21.01.2015 | DK | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | ES | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | HR | 21.01.2015 | LT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | MK | 21.01.2015 | MT | 21.01.2015 | NL | 21.01.2015 | PL | 21.01.2015 | PT | 21.01.2015 | RO | 21.01.2015 | SE | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SK | 21.01.2015 | SM | 21.01.2015 | TR | 21.01.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | NO | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.12.2009 | |
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 01.12.2009 | |
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 21.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US5513719 (MOROTO SHUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,11,13 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 57; figure 1 * [A] 12 [I] 3,14-16; | [XAI]US5562565 (MOROTO SHUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,11,13 * figures 1-6 * [A] 12 [I] 3,14-16; | [X]WO9921263 (STRIDSBERG INNOVATION AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,4 * line 15 - page 8, line 36; figure 4a *; | [A]WO2007062630 (HYTRAC GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-4* figures 1,3 * | Examination | WO2010029035 |