EP2286183 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A DISPLAY DEVICE DRIVEN BY AT LEAST ONE STEPPING MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Anschütz GmbH Zeyestrasse 16-24 24106 Kiel / DE | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEY, Ulf Busdorfer Weg 8 24625 Grossharrie / DE | 02 /
SKERKA, Wolfgang PattburgerStrasse 36 24768 Rendsburg / DE | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Lobemeier, Martin Landolf, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Holtenauer Strasse 57 24105 Kiel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Lobemeier, Martin Landolf, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Niemannsweg 133 24105 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2011/39] | Biehl, Christian, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Biehl Schlieffenallee 5 24105 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2011/08] | Biehl, Christian, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Niemannsweg 133 24105 Kiel / DE | Application number, filing date | 09765432.1 | 04.06.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009DE00780 | Priority number, date | DE20081028803 | 19.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008028803 | [2011/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009152796 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2286183 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2286183 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01C17/26, H02P8/22, H02P8/34, H02P8/38, G01C17/36, G01C19/40, G01P1/07, G01C19/36 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
G01C17/26 (EP,US);
G01C17/36 (EP,US);
G01C19/40 (EP,US);
H02P5/00 (EP);
H02P8/14 (EP,US);
H02P8/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES MIT WENIGSTENS EINEM SCHRITTMOTOR ANGETRIEBENEN ANZEIGEGERÄTS | [2011/08] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A DISPLAY DEVICE DRIVEN BY AT LEAST ONE STEPPING MOTOR | [2011/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE ENTRAÎNÉ PAR AU MOINS UN MOTEUR PAS À PAS | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 17.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2009 | BG | 03.07.2013 | CY | 03.07.2013 | CZ | 03.07.2013 | DK | 03.07.2013 | EE | 03.07.2013 | FI | 03.07.2013 | HR | 03.07.2013 | IT | 03.07.2013 | LT | 03.07.2013 | LV | 03.07.2013 | MC | 03.07.2013 | MK | 03.07.2013 | MT | 03.07.2013 | NL | 03.07.2013 | PL | 03.07.2013 | RO | 03.07.2013 | SE | 03.07.2013 | SI | 03.07.2013 | SK | 03.07.2013 | TR | 03.07.2013 | NO | 03.10.2013 | GR | 04.10.2013 | ES | 14.10.2013 | IS | 03.11.2013 | PT | 04.11.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 03.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | FI | 03.07.2013 | |
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 03.07.2013 | |
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 03.07.2013 | |
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 03.07.2013 | |
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 03.07.2013 | |
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 03.07.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2120413 (ANSCHUETZ & CO GMBH) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2239526 (TOKIMEC INC [JP]) [A] 1-4 * figures 1,5 * * page 2, lines 6-30 * * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 11 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 18 *; | [A]EP0571759 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0666643 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]GB2292026 (DELCO ELECTRONIC OVERSEAS CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5640075 (BRASSEUR GEORG [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5770937 (TSUDA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5844393 (VU HUNG D [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19821835 (RAYTHEON MARINE GMBH [DE]) [A] 4 * the whole document * |