EP2286105 - DUAL CLUTCH WITH ROTARY VIBRATION DAMPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2012/11] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGNER, Ivo Hornisgrindestrasse 22 77815 Bühl / DE | [2011/08] | Application number, filing date | 09765435.4 | 08.06.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009DE00793 | Priority number, date | DE20081028235 | 16.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008028235 | DE20081035146 | 28.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008035146 | DE20091011768 | 09.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009011768 | [2011/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009152799 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2286105 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2286105 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/10, F16F15/14 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
F16F15/145 (EP,US);
F16D21/06 (US);
F16D25/0638 (EP);
F16D25/10 (EP,US);
F16D3/12 (US);
F16D3/66 (US);
F16F15/123 (EP,US);
F16D2021/0607 (US);
F16D2021/0661 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | DOPPELKUPPLUNG MIT DREHSCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFER | [2011/08] | English: | DUAL CLUTCH WITH ROTARY VIBRATION DAMPER | [2011/08] | French: | DOUBLE EMBRAYAGE À AMORTISSEUR DE VIBRATIONS TORSIONNELLES | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 02.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2009 | CY | 13.02.2013 | CZ | 13.02.2013 | DK | 13.02.2013 | EE | 13.02.2013 | FI | 13.02.2013 | HR | 13.02.2013 | IT | 13.02.2013 | LT | 13.02.2013 | LV | 13.02.2013 | MC | 13.02.2013 | MK | 13.02.2013 | MT | 13.02.2013 | NL | 13.02.2013 | PL | 13.02.2013 | RO | 13.02.2013 | SE | 13.02.2013 | SI | 13.02.2013 | SK | 13.02.2013 | TR | 13.02.2013 | BG | 13.05.2013 | NO | 13.05.2013 | GR | 14.05.2013 | ES | 24.05.2013 | GB | 08.06.2013 | IE | 08.06.2013 | LU | 08.06.2013 | IS | 13.06.2013 | PT | 13.06.2013 | BE | 30.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 13.02.2013 | |
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MK | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
TR | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
GB | 08.06.2013 | ||
IE | 08.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 13.02.2013 | |
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
GB | 08.06.2013 | ||
IE | 08.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
GB | 08.06.2013 | ||
IE | 08.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
GB | 08.06.2013 | ||
IE | 08.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IE | 08.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 13.02.2013 | |
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 13.02.2013 | |
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
NO | 13.05.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19804227 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE10034730 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 16 *; | [A]DE10224874 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102004004176 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1744074 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1780434 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1865222 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * |