EP2294869 - Identifying multi-component carrier cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/11] | IDENTIFYING MULTI-COMPONENT CARRIER CELLS | ||
[2013/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDOFF, Bengt Morkullevägen 45 S-237 36 Bjärred / SE | 02 /
PARKVALL, Stefan Västmannagatan 53 S-113 25 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
JADING, Ylva Västmannagatan 81 B S-113 26 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
DAHLMAN, Erik Tackjärnsvägen 12 S-168 68 Bromma / SE | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Åkerman, Mårten Lennart Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms Nya Vattentornet 221 83 Lund / SE | [2013/45] |
Former [2011/11] | Akerman, Marten Lennart Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms Nya Vattentornet 221 83 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 09765745.6 | 03.06.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009EP56799 | Priority number, date | US20080073793 | 19.06.2008 Original published format: US 73793 | US20080326658 | 02.12.2008 Original published format: US 326658 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009153165 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2294869 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2294869 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04J11/00 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,BR,CN,US);
H04J11/0069 (EP,BR,CN,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,BR,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/11] | H04W48/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | Identifizierung von Vielfachkomponententräger-Zellen | [2013/26] | English: | Identifying multi-component carrier cells | [2013/26] | French: | Identification de cellules à porteuses à plusieurs composantes | [2013/26] |
Former [2011/11] | IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON MEHRKOMPONENTEN-TRÄGERZELLEN | ||
Former [2011/11] | IDENTIFYING MULTI-COMPONENT CARRIER CELLS | ||
Former [2011/11] | IDENTIFICATION DE CELLULES À PORTEUSES À PLUSIEURS COMPOSANTES | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 28.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13174490.6 / EP2648460 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2009 | AT | 06.11.2013 | BE | 06.11.2013 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | HR | 06.11.2013 | IT | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | MK | 06.11.2013 | MT | 06.11.2013 | PL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SE | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | NO | 06.02.2014 | GR | 07.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | IE | 03.06.2014 | LU | 03.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | FR | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 03.06.2009 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 03.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 03.06.2009 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 03.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 03.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 03.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 03.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 03.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 03.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | |
NO | 06.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007183307 (AKITA HIDENORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] * * paragraph [0025] * * figures 1,4,5,8-10 *; | [A]EP1919246 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0038] * | [A] - MOTOHIRO TANNO ET AL, "Evolved UTRA - physical layer overview", SIGNAL PROCESSING ADVANCES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, 2007. SPAWC 200 7. IEEE 8TH WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PI, (20070601), ISBN 978-1-4244-0954-9, pages 1 - 8, XP031189507 [A] 1-31 * chapter 2.5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SPAWC.2007.4401427 | [A] - ATTAR R ET AL, "Evolution of cdma2000 cellular networks: multicarrier EV-DO", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20060301), vol. 44, no. 3, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 46 - 53, XP002415258 [A] 1-31 * abstract * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2006.1607865 |