EP2294113 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A POLYAMIDEIMIDE, A POLYAMIDEIMIDE AND COMPOSITION COMPRISING THIS POLYAMIDEIMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodia Opérations 40, Rue de La Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Rhodia Opérations 40 Rue de La Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOURAUD, Franck Le Chamboud F-38780 Eyzin Pinet / FR | 02 /
BOSSENNEC, Véronique 21 allée du Bois Rond F-69360 Serezin De Rhone / FR | 03 /
JEOL, Stéphane 14 rue Masséna F-69006 Lyon / FR | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
TOURAUD, Franck Le Chamboud F-38780 Eyzin Pinet / FR | ||
02 /
BOSSENNEC, Véronique 21 allée du Bois Rond F-69360 Serezin De Rhone / FR | |||
03 /
JEOL, Stéphane 91 cours Vitton F-69006 Lyon / FR | Representative(s) | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de la Fusée, 98 1130 Haren / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al SOLVAY SA Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2011/11] | Valentino, Cédric, et al RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle C.R.T.L., BP 62 85, rue des Frères Perret 69192 Saint-Fons / FR | Application number, filing date | 09765750.6 | 05.06.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009EP56915 | Priority number, date | FR20080003263 | 12.06.2008 Original published format: FR 0803263 | [2011/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009153170 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2294113 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/14, C08G73/10, C08L79/08, C08L77/06 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
C08G73/14 (EP,US);
C08G73/1075 (EP,US);
C08G73/1082 (EP,US);
C08L77/06 (EP,US);
C08L79/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L77/06, C08L2666/20 (EP,US);
C08L79/08, C08L2666/20 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES POLYAMIDIMIDS, POLYAMIDIMID UND DIESES POLYAMIDIMID UMFASSENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2011/11] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A POLYAMIDEIMIDE, A POLYAMIDEIMIDE AND COMPOSITION COMPRISING THIS POLYAMIDEIMIDE | [2011/11] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN POLYAMIDEIMIDE, POLYAMIDEIMIDE ET COMPOSITION COMPRENANT CE POLYAMIDEIMIDE | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 23.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 02.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5550208 (RICHARDSON JOEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-18,20-21 * example 6 * [Y] 19; | [XY]EP0470464 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-18,20-21 * examples 1-3 * * page 2, line 1 - line 2 * [Y] 19; | [XY]US3792061 (MERTEN R, et al) [X] 1-18,20-21 * example 6 * [Y] 19; | [XAY]US5395870 (SUZUKI YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-18,20-21 * column 1, line 9 - line 17 * * colonne 4, exemple 10 de préparation * [A] 19 [Y] 1-18,20-21; | [XAY]US4124419 (KESKE ROBERT G) [X] 1-18,20-21 * example 1 * * column 1, line 4 - line 7 * [A] 19 [Y] 1-18,20-21; | [YA]US3961009 (YODA NAOYA, et al) [Y] 19 * example 14 * [A] 1-18,20-21 | Examination | JPS58162637 | by applicant | US5550208 |