EP2310757 - AIR DESTRATIFIER FOR SPACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chore-Time Europe B.V. 34 Industrieterrein 5981 NK Panningen / NL | [2018/21] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states C.G.M. S.r.l. Via Savigliano 37 U/T 12030 Monasterolo di Savigliano CN / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASSIMINO, Gianpiero Strada Collarea 13 I-12038 Savigliano (Cuneo) / IT | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Barton, Matthew Thomas Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Rondano, Davide, et al Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 09766213.4 | 18.02.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009IB50655 | Priority number, date | IT2008TO00468 | 16.06.2008 Original published format: IT TO20080468 | [2011/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009153673 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2310757 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2310757 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F24F7/06 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
F24F7/065 (EP,US);
F24F7/007 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2011/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LUFTUMWÄLZER FÜR RÄUME | [2017/35] | English: | AIR DESTRATIFIER FOR SPACES | [2011/16] | French: | DÉSTRATIFICATEUR D'AIR POUR ESPACES | [2011/16] |
Former [2011/16] | LUFTDESTRATIFIKATOR FÜR RÄUME | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 21.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 16.04.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | LU | 18.02.2019 | MT | 18.02.2019 | HU | 19.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/31] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
MT | 18.02.2019 | ||
HU | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
MT | 18.02.2019 | ||
HU | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
HU | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
HU | 19.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 30.05.2018 | |
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR826255 (CALOR SA) [X] 1,3,4,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US3827342 (HUGHES G) [A] 1,4-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US4152973 (PETERSON FRED M) [X] 1,3,4,9,10 * column 1, line 14 - column 5, line 22; figures 1,3,8 *; | [X]US4255176 (MACROW LAWRENCE) [X] 1,3-6 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 41; figure 1 *; | [A]US4526592 (ARMBRUSTER JOSEPH M [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract ** figures 1,3 *; | [X]JPH0350433 (SANKURU KK) [X] 1,5 * the whole document * * abstract * |