EP2301029 - SERVO CONTROL IN TAPE DRIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2011/13] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERUBINI, Giovanni IBM Research GmbH Zurich Research Laboratory Saeumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rueschlikon / CH | 02 /
JELITTO, Jens IBM Research GmbH Zurich Research Laboratory Saeumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rueschlikon / CH | 03 /
LANTZ, Mark A. IBM Research GmbH Zurich Research Laboratory Saeumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rueschlikon / CH | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Klett, Peter Michael c/o IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Postfach 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Klett, Peter Michael IBM Research GmbH Zurich Research Laboratory Intellectual Property Law Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 09766277.9 | 17.06.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009IB52577 | Priority number, date | EP20080104461 | 18.06.2008 Original published format: EP 08104461 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009153740 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2301029 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/58, G11B15/43 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
G11B5/58 (EP,US);
G11B15/093 (EP,US);
G11B15/43 (EP,US);
G11B5/596 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | SERVOREGELUNG IN BANDLAUFWERKEN | [2011/13] | English: | SERVO CONTROL IN TAPE DRIVES | [2011/13] | French: | SERVOCOMMANDE DANS LES LECTEURS DE BANDES | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 01.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 15.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US2938962 (KONINS JULIUS A, et al) [I] 1,3,8-11 * column 10, line 72 - column 11, line 22; figures 2,6,7 * [Y] 2,4-7,12-15; | [YD]US2004141250 (HARPER DAVID H [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0010]; figures 1,4,5 *; | [YD]US6724559 (KONISHI HIRONAO [JP], et al) [YD] 1-15 * column 12, line 56 - column 15, line 3; figures 2,6,7,18.20,21,22 *; | [Y]WO0175874 (STORAGE TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * pages 9-12; figures 2,3,4,9,15 *; | [Y]GB2362984 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * pages 1-3; figures 7,8 * |