EP2364271 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HIGH-PURITY SILICON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmid Silicon Technology GmbH Robert-Bosch-Strasse 32-34 72250 Freudenstadt / DE | [2016/52] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Schmid Silicon Technology Gmbh Robert-Bosch-Strasse 32-34 72250 Freudenstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETRIK, Adolf Wölperwiesenweg 7 72250 Freudenstadt / DE | 02 /
SCHMID, Christian Zeppelinstrasse 18 72250 Freudenstadt / DE | 03 /
HAHN, Jochem Tilsiter Strasse 4 72108 Rottenburg / DE | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Cartagena Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Klement, Eberle mbB Urbanstraße 53 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/52] |
Former [2011/37] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09767954.2 | 27.11.2009 | [2016/52] | WO2009EP08457 | Priority number, date | DE20081059408 | 27.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008059408 | [2011/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010060630 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2364271 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2364271 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/027, C01B33/029, C01B33/03, B01J19/24 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
C01B33/027 (EP,US);
C01B33/029 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/2405 (EP,KR,US);
C01B33/03 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REINSTSILZIUM | [2011/37] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HIGH-PURITY SILICON | [2011/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE SILICIUM ULTRA-PUR | [2011/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 29.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2009 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | MK | 28.12.2016 | MT | 28.12.2016 | NL | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | SM | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | BG | 28.03.2017 | NO | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 27.11.2009 | |
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
MT | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 27.11.2009 | |
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MT | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.11.2009 | |
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MT | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MT | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2814751 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-21 * page 5, lines 14-28 * * page 9, lines 1-16 * * page 11, lines 1-28 * * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 21 * * figure 3 *; | [A]DE2844557 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-21 * page 4, line 1 - page 8, line 19; figures 2,3 * * page 9, line 11 - page 11, line 22 *; | [X]US4162291 (ARCELLA FRANK G [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [X]US4343772 (FROSCH ROBERT A ADMINISTRATOR, et al) [X] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006009456 (INST ENERGITEKNIK [NO], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 3, line 29 - page 8, line 10 ** page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 40 *; | [A]JP2008264638 (SANYO KAGI KOFUN YUGENKOSHI) [A] 1-21 * abstract * |