EP2364384 - FIBROUS STRUCTURES COMPRISING A LOTION AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2011/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANIFOLD, John, Allen 8091 East S.R. 48 Milan Indiana 47031 / US | 02 /
SANDS, Kathleen, Diane 7972 Kennesaw Drive West Chester Ohio 45069 / US | 03 /
RASCH, David, Mark 4870 Orland Road Cincinnati Ohio 45244 / US | 04 /
NUGENT, Jeremy, Howard 4463 Goldendawn Way Liberty Township Ohio 45044 / US | 05 /
DONNER, Christopher, Gerald 7047 Lookout Court Liberty Township Ohio 45044 / US | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 09768278.5 | 03.12.2009 | WO2009US66473 | Priority number, date | US20080119492P | 03.12.2008 Original published format: US 119492 P | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010065684 | Date: | 10.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2364384 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D04H13/00, D21H27/30, D21H27/00 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
D21H27/002 (EP,US);
D04H1/42 (EP,US);
D04H1/4374 (EP,US);
D04H1/46 (EP,US);
D21H27/30 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24603 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24934 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FASERGEBILDE MIT LOTION UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/37] | English: | FIBROUS STRUCTURES COMPRISING A LOTION AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME | [2011/37] | French: | STRUCTURES FIBREUSES COMPRENANT UNE LOTION ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE CELLES-CI | [2011/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 25.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/29] | 01.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3708366 (DONNELLY H) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAYI]US4806418 (SIGL WAYNE C [US]) [X] 1,5,7,15 * the whole document * [A] 6 [Y] 8 [I] 2-4,9-14; | [XY]EP1312466 (SCA HYGIENE PROD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * the whole document * [Y] 8; | [XYI]WO2005035857 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 1 - paragraph 6 * * page 12, paragraph 1; figures 1-4; claims 1-12 * [Y] 8 [I] 7,9-10; | [A]US2005230069 (HILBIG KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0103]; claims 1-11 *; | [YA]WO2005106119 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [Y] 8 * the whole document *[A] 1-7,9-15; | [A]WO2006036586 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 8, line 19 - page 15, line 5; figure 3; claims 1-14 *; | [YA]WO2007031965 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [Y] 8 * the whole document * [A] 1-7,9-15; | [A]WO2008036038 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |