EP2318030 - THERAPEUTIC PROTEINS FROM LATEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pele Nova Biotecnologia S.A. Rodovia BR 262, KM 372 79190-000 Terenos - MS / BR | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MRUE, Fátima Rua S-05, 81 Quadra S-04 Lote25-27 - Apto 102 Residencial Guaianã - Setor Bela Vista 74823-460 Goiânia - GO / BR | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
MRUE, Fátima Rua S-05, 81 Quadra S-04 Lote25-27 - Apto 102 Residencial Guaianã - Setor Bela Vista 74823-460 Goiânia - GO / BR | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2011/19] | Collin, Jérôme, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09768651.3 | 26.06.2009 | [2011/19] | WO2009BR00185 | Priority number, date | BR2008PI04885 | 26.06.2008 Original published format: BR PI0804885 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009155678 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2318030 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2318030 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K36/47, // A61P29/00 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
A61K38/168 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/19] | A61K38/16, A61K36/47 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE PROTEINE AUS LATEX | [2011/19] | English: | THERAPEUTIC PROTEINS FROM LATEX | [2011/19] | French: | PROTÉINES THÉRAPEUTIQUES PROVENANT DU LATEX | [2011/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 31.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2009 | AT | 30.10.2013 | BE | 30.10.2013 | BG | 30.10.2013 | CY | 30.10.2013 | CZ | 30.10.2013 | DK | 30.10.2013 | EE | 30.10.2013 | ES | 30.10.2013 | FI | 30.10.2013 | HR | 30.10.2013 | IT | 30.10.2013 | LT | 30.10.2013 | LV | 30.10.2013 | MC | 30.10.2013 | MK | 30.10.2013 | MT | 30.10.2013 | NL | 30.10.2013 | PL | 30.10.2013 | RO | 30.10.2013 | SE | 30.10.2013 | SI | 30.10.2013 | SK | 30.10.2013 | TR | 30.10.2013 | NO | 30.01.2014 | GR | 31.01.2014 | IS | 28.02.2014 | PT | 28.02.2014 | IE | 26.06.2014 | LU | 26.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 26.06.2009 | |
AT | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
TR | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.06.2009 | |
AT | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 30.10.2013 | |
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 30.10.2013 | |
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 30.10.2013 | |
NO | 30.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - MARTIN M N, "The Latex of Hevea brasiliensis Contains High Levels of Both Chitinases and Chitinases/Lysozymes", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (19910201), vol. 95, no. 2, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 469 - 476, XP009155631 [A] 1-15 *cf. abstract, page 470, right-hand col. 1st para., page 471, last para. of the right col.* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.95.2.469 | [A] - POSCH ET AL, "Characterization and identification of latex allergens by two-dimensional electrophoresis and protein microsequencing", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, MOSBY, INC, US, (19970301), vol. 99, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0091-6749(97)70057-5, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 385 - 395, XP005154357 [A] 1-15 *cf. background at page 385* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(97)70057-5 | International search | [X]US6759517 (CARDOSA MARY JANE [MY], et al); | [X]US2004171812 (MAD ARIF SITI ARIJA [MY], et al); | [A] - WITISUWANNAKUL R. ET AL., "A lectin from the bark of the rubber tree (Hevea brasiliensis).", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 183 - 187, XP004293692 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(97)00329-4 | [A] - ROGERIO ALEXANDRE P. ET AL., "Anti-asthmatic potential of a D- galactose-binding lectin from Synadenium carinatum latex.", GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 17, no. 8, pages 795 - 804, XP008142319 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/cwm053 |