EP2294312 - RADIATION THERAPY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alberta Health Services 1500, 10123 - 99th Street Edmonton, AB T5J 3H1 / CA | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlone, Marco 125 Hayward Crescent Edmonton, AB T6R 3G3 / CA | 02 /
Fallone, B, Gino 1109 Falconer Road Edmonton, Alberta T6R 2G6 / CA | 03 /
Murray, Brad 68 Woodlake Court Sherwood Park, AB T8A 4C1 / CA | [2011/36] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
Carlone, Marco 125 Hayward Crescent Edmonton, AB T6R 3G3 / CA | ||
02 /
Fallone, Gino B. 1109 Falconer Road Edmonton, AB T6R 2G6 / CA | |||
03 /
Murray, Brad 68 Woodlake Court Sherwood Park, AB T8A 4C1 / CA | Representative(s) | Naismith, Robert Stewart Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [2016/17] |
Former [2011/11] | Naismith, Robert Stewart Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09768670.3 | 25.06.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009CA00873 | Priority number, date | US20080129411 | 24.06.2008 Original published format: US 129411 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009155700 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2294312 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2294312 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/48 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
A61N5/1049 (EP,US);
A61N5/1067 (US);
A61B5/055 (US);
G01R33/34 (US);
G01R33/385 (US);
G01R33/4812 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | A61N5/10, A61B5/055, G01R33/38 | ||
Former IPC [2011/11] | F03B13/18, E02B9/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2011/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STRAHLENTHERAPIESYSTEM | [2011/11] | English: | RADIATION THERAPY SYSTEM | [2011/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RADIOTHÉRAPIE | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 16.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.11.2015 | 03.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2009 | AT | 27.04.2016 | BE | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | ES | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | HR | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | IT | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | MK | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | IE | 25.06.2016 | LU | 25.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | NO | 27.07.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 25.06.2009 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 25.06.2016 | ||
LU | 25.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 25.06.2009 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 25.06.2016 | ||
LU | 25.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 25.06.2009 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 25.06.2016 | ||
LU | 25.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.06.2009 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 25.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 25.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9932189 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES [US]) [Y] 1-5 * column 9, line 12 - line 23 * * page 13, line 26 - page 14, line 32 * * page 16, line 7 - page 17, line 32; figure 4 *; | [AD]US6862469 (BUCHOLZ RICHARD D [US], et al) [AD] 1,5* figures 1-3,10 *; | [Y]WO2007045076 (ALBERTA CANCER BOARD [CA], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 8, line 7 - column 9, line 19; figure 3 * | International search | [A]WO9966198 (FELDMAN YOSEF [IL], et al); | [A]WO03014560 (OCEAN POWER TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]CA2408855 (STROMOTICH FRANK LOUIS [CA]) |