EP2288854 - T-SHAPED BRANCH PART, PARTICULARLY FOR A VENTILATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pluggit GmbH Valentin-Linhof-Straße 2 81829 München / DE | [2015/23] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Pluggit International B.V. Lange Voorhout 82 2514 EJ S-Gravenhage / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFEIFFER, Georg Knappertsbuschstrasse 37 81829 München / DE | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2014/16] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2011/09] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Cronstettenstraße 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09768908.7 | 10.06.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009EP04153 | Priority number, date | DE20081028613 | 18.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008028613 | [2011/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009156059 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2288854 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2288854 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/72, F16L41/02, F24F13/02, F24F13/14 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
F16L41/021 (EP);
F24F11/72 (EP);
F24F13/0236 (EP);
F24F13/029 (EP);
F24F13/1413 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/09] | F24F13/02, F24F13/14, F24F11/02, F16L41/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2011/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | T-FÖRMIGES ABZWEIGSTÜCK, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN LÜFTUNGSSYSTEM | [2011/09] | English: | T-SHAPED BRANCH PART, PARTICULARLY FOR A VENTILATION SYSTEM | [2011/09] | French: | RACCORD EN T, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN SYSTÈME DE VENTILATION | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 12.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2009 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | MT | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | PT | 08.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 10.06.2009 | |
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
MT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 10.06.2009 | |
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | CZ | 08.08.2018 | |
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 08.08.2018 | |
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CZ | 08.08.2018 | |
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 08.08.2018 | |
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 08.08.2018 | |
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 08.08.2018 | |
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP1582822 (PLUGGIT INT NV [AN]) [DX] 1,2,11-13,17 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0409779 (HESCO PILGERSTEG AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,11-13,17 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3218165 (TURBON TUNZINI KLIMATECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1,2,11-13,17 * page 6, line 4 - page 9, line 34; figures 1-3 *; | [X]JPS61262534 (NAT HOUSE IND) [X] 1,2,11-13,17 * abstract *; | [X]JPS6212087U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,11,13,17 * abstract *; | [X]JPS5526210U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,11,13,17 * abstract * | Examination | CH598549 | DE202006004839U | DE202005007613U |