EP2299995 - COMBINATION OF AMIDINE DERIVATES WITH CYCLIC DEPSIPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Animal Health GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARDER, Achim Europa Ring 54 51109 Köln / DE | 02 /
NERGER, Dittmar Central Residence 2/2908 167 Hua Shan Road, Lane 1038 Shanghai 200050 / CN | 03 /
BACH, Thomas Berghauserstrasse 18 42349 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
KANIKANTI, Venkata - Rangarao Quettinger Str . 24a 51381 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
KUJANEK, Richard Scheuermühlenstrasse 10 51147 Köln / DE | [2011/26] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
HARDER, Achim Europa Ring 54 51109 Köln / DE | ||
02 /
NERGER, Dittmar 167 Lane 1038 Hua Shan Road Shanghai 200050 / CN | |||
03 /
BACH, Thomas Berghauserstrasse 18 42349 Wuppertal / DE | |||
04 /
KANIKANTI, Venkata - Rangarao Quettinger Str . 24a 51381 Leverkusen / DE | |||
05 /
KUJANEK, Richard Scheuermühlenstrasse 10 51147 Köln / DE | |||
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
HARDER, Achim Europa Ring 54 51109 Köln / DE | ||
02 /
NERGER, Dittmar 167 Lane 1038 Hua Shan Road Shanghai 200050 / CN | |||
03 /
BACH, Thomas Berghauserstrasse 18 42349 Wuppertal / DE | |||
04 /
KANIKANTI, Venkata - Rangarao Quettinger Str . 24a 51381 Leverkusen / DE | |||
05 /
KUJANEK, Richard Scheuermühlenstrasse 10 51147 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 09768920.2 | 16.06.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009EP04304 | Priority number, date | DE20081030764 | 28.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008030764 | [2011/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009156071 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299995 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/155, A61K38/15, A61P33/10 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K38/15 (EP,US);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | KOMBINATION VON AMIDIN-DERIVATEN MIT CYCLISCHEN DEPSIPEPTIDEN | [2011/13] | English: | COMBINATION OF AMIDINE DERIVATES WITH CYCLIC DEPSIPEPTIDES | [2011/13] | French: | COMBINAISON DE DÉRIVÉS D'AMIDINE AVEC DES DEPSIPEPTIDES CYCLIQUES | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 11.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY] - TOMLINSON G ET AL, "THE EFFECTS OF AMIDANTEL BAY-D-8815 AMIDANTEL AND ITS DEACYLATED DERIVATIVE BAY-D-9216 N-4-1 DIMETHYLAMINOETHYLIDENEAMINOANILINE ON CAENORHABDITIS-ELEGANS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (19850101), vol. 113, no. 2, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 255 - 262, XP002516268 [X] 9 * abstract * * page 255, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 255, column 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(85)90743-5 | [XY] - XIAO S H ET AL, "Tribendimidine: a promising, safe and broad-spectrum anthelmintic agent from China", ACTA TROPICA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050401), vol. 94, no. 1, ISSN 0001-706X, pages 1 - 14, XP004816420 [X] 9 * abstract * * page 4, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 5, column 1, paragraph 4 * [Y] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actatropica.2005.01.013 | [XY] - AMLIWALA KIRAN ; BULL KATHRYN ; WILLSON JAMES ; HARDER ACHIM ; HOLDEN-DYE LINDY ; WALKER ROBERT J., "Emodepside, a cyclo-octadepsipeptide anthelmintic with a novel mode of action", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, SPAIN, (2004), vol. 29, no. 10, pages 1015 - 1024, XP002547926 [X] 9 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 1016, column 2, paragraphs 2,3 * [Y] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2004.029.10.863392 |