EP2293472 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION BASE STATION APPARATUS AND REFERENCE SIGNAL ALLOCATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIO, Akihiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NAKAO, Seigo c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
HIRAMATSU, Katsuhiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09769877.3 | 22.06.2009 | [2011/10] | WO2009JP02823 | Priority number, date | JP20080163034 | 23.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008163034 | [2011/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009157167 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2293472 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04B7/04, H04J1/00, H04J99/00, H04W16/28, H04W72/04, H04W88/08 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04W72/56 (EP,US);
H04W28/02 (EP,US);
H04B7/0413 (EP,US);
H04L25/0202 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSBASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND REFERENZSIGNALZUTEILUNGSVERFAHREN | [2011/10] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION BASE STATION APPARATUS AND REFERENCE SIGNAL ALLOCATION METHOD | [2011/10] | French: | APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ATTRIBUTION DE SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE | [2011/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2010 | Translation filed | 16.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 06.07.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AP]WO2009025081 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A] - ZTE, 'TECHNICAL POINTS FOR LTE-ADVANCED', R1-081773, (200805), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsgran/WG1RL1/TSGR153/Docs/R1-081773.zip, XP008147207 | [A] - NTT DOCOMO, 'PROPOSALS FOR LTE-ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES', R1-081948, (20080505), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_53/DOCS/R1-081948.zip, XP008139249 | [A] - 3GPP, '3GPP TS 36.211 V8.3.0', (200805), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/36_series/36.211/36211-830.zip, XP002554704 | [A] - NORTEL, 'PERFORMANCE EVALUATION OF DEDICATED RS STRUCTURE FOR BEAM-FORMING TRANSMISSION', RL- 080767, (20080211), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsgran/WG1RL1/TSGR152/Docs/R1-080767.zip | [A] - SAMSUNG ET AL., 'REFERENCE SIGNAL TRANSMISSION IN DWPTS', RL-080041, (20080114), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_51b/Docs/Rl-080041.zip | [A] - SAMSUNG, POWER SCALING AND DL RS BOOSTING', R1-081231, (20080331), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_52b/Docs/R1-081231.zip, XP050109675 | [A] - TD TECH, 'RS CONFIGURATION IN DWPTS', R1-080781, (20080211), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1RL1/TSGR152/Docs/R1-080781.zip | by applicant | JP2008163034 |