EP2289629 - DEVICE FOR EJECTING MIXED GAS TO WHICH LIQUID IS ADDED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Tansan Gas Co., Ltd. 12-15, Aoi 3-Chome Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-0012 / JP | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZAKI Yoji c/o NIPPON TANSAN GAS CO. LTD. 12-15, Aoi 3-chome Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-0012 / JP | 02 /
ARAI Junichi c/o NIPPON TANSAN GAS CO. LTD. 12-15, Aoi 3-chome Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-0012 / JP | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Smallman, Clint Guy, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara 120 Bridge Road GB-Chertsey, Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09770147.8 | 23.06.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009JP61396 | Priority number, date | JP20080169248 | 27.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008169248 | JP20080169249 | 27.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008169249 | [2011/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009157437 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2289629 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/04, A61C17/02, A61C17/022, B65D83/44 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
A61C17/02 (EP,US);
A61C17/028 (EP,US);
A61C15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSSTOSSEN EINES MISCHGASES MIT FLÜSSIGKEITSZUSATZ | [2011/09] | English: | DEVICE FOR EJECTING MIXED GAS TO WHICH LIQUID IS ADDED | [2011/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉJECTION DE GAZ MÉLANGÉ AUQUEL EST AJOUTÉ UN LIQUIDE | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2010 | Translation filed | 09.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 14.08.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0636614U (SANKYO CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPH07277380 (NIPPON TANSAN GAS CO LTD); | [A]JPH10218263 (OSAKA SHIPBUILDING); | [X]WO0192131 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH08141450 |