EP2285432 - REDUCED-PRESSURE DRESSING ASSEMBLIES FOR USE IN APPLYING A CLOSING FORCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265 / US | [2019/25] |
Former [2017/31] | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265 / US | ||
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. 12930 IH-10 West San Antonio, TX 78249-2248 / US | ||
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US | ||
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. Legal Department - Intellectual Property P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAZALA, Jr., Richard, Marvin 16331 Persimmon Well San Antonio TX 78247 / US | 02 /
LONG, Justin, Alexander 6335 Mustang Point Dr. San Antonio TX 78240 / US | 03 /
KNOWLES, Kenneth, Mitchel 2101 Chimpan Ct. Bandera TX 78003 / US | 04 /
BARTA, Eric, Woodson 14003 Cedar Mill San Antonio TX 78231 / US | [2011/14] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
KAZALA, Richard, Marvin 16331 Persimmon Well San Antonio TX 78247 / US | ||
02 /
LONG, Justin, Alexander 6335 Mustang Point Dr. San Antonio TX 78240 / US | |||
03 /
KNOWLES, Kenneth, Mitchel 2101 Chimpan Ct. Bandera TX 78003 / US | |||
04 /
BARTA, Eric, Woodson 14003 Cedar Mill San Antonio TX 78231 / US | Representative(s) | Cordina, Kevin John Simmons & Simmons LLP CityPoint One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2019/25] |
Former [2012/42] | Cordina, Kevin John, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2012/13] | Ashton, Timothy, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/08] | Ashton, Timothy Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09770661.8 | 29.05.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009US45747 | Priority number, date | US20080057797P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57797 P | US20080057802P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57802 P | US20080057800P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57800 P | US20080057805P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57805 P | US20090144067P | 12.01.2009 Original published format: US 144067 P | US20080121362P | 10.12.2008 Original published format: US 121362 P | US20080057798P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57798 P | US20080057803P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57803 P | US20080057808P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57808 P | US20080057810P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57810 P | US20080057807P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57807 P | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009158126 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2285432 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2285432 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2285432 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02, A61M1/00, A61F13/00, A61L15/60 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
A61F13/022 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/0289 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/00059 (US);
A61F13/01017 (US);
A61F13/01029 (US);
A61F13/01034 (US);
A61F13/01038 (US);
A61F13/0209 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/0223 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/0243 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/05 (EP,CN,US);
A61F15/008 (EP,US);
A61H1/008 (EP,US);
A61L15/60 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/71 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/915 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/917 (EP);
A61F13/00 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00131 (US);
A61F2013/00136 (US);
A61F2013/00174 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/00182 (US);
A61F2013/00246 (US);
A61F2013/0028 (US);
A61F2013/00536 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/0054 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/00748 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/916 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/70 (US);
A61M2207/00 (US);
A61M2210/1007 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1021 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/08] | A61M1/00, A61F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2011/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WUNDVERBANDANORDNUNGEN MIT REDUZIERTEM DRUCK ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER ANBRINGUNG EINER VERSCHLUSSKRAFT | [2011/08] | English: | REDUCED-PRESSURE DRESSING ASSEMBLIES FOR USE IN APPLYING A CLOSING FORCE | [2011/08] | French: | ENSEMBLES DE PANSEMENT À PRESSION RÉDUITE POUR UTILISATION DANS L APPLICATION D UNE FORCE DE FERMETURE | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 15.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16160705.6 / EP3069702 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2016
ADMISSIBLE Smith & Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US Opponent's representative HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2016
ADMISSIBLE Smith & Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US Opponent's representative HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | 31.01.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.06.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2018 | 12.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.12.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.05.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2009 | AT | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | LU | 29.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.05.2009 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.05.2009 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03057071 (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US], et al) [Y] 2,12,16,19 * page 4, lines 11-14 *; | [XY]US2006079852 (BUBB STEPHEN K [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,15,20-21 * paragraphs [0091] , [0092] , [0141] - [0144]; figures 7,8,26 * [Y] 2,12,16,19; | [A]DE102005007016 (FLEISCHMANN WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1-22* paragraphs [0041] - [0045]; figures 4-7 * | Opposition | WO9006735 | WO9514451 | WO2005091884 | US2006079852 | WO2009112848 | WO2009158126 | WO2009158125 | EP2262549 | EP2279016 |