EP2308103 - LIGHT CONVERTING CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Terry, L. 3m Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
HAASE, Michael, A. 3m Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Jun-Ying 3m Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09770693.1 | 03.06.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009US46083 | Priority number, date | US20080075935P | 26.06.2008 Original published format: US 75935 P | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009158159 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2308103 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/44, H01L33/50, // H01L33/08 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
H01L33/44 (EP,US);
H01L33/502 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2933/0091 (EP,US);
H01L33/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/15] | H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | LICHTUMWANDLUNGSKONSTRUKTION | [2011/15] | English: | LIGHT CONVERTING CONSTRUCTION | [2011/15] | French: | CONSTRUCTION DE CONVERSION DE LUMIÈRE | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 23.05.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0559141 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * page 4, line 41 - page 6, line 20; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1174931 (NICHIA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0073] *; | [A]EP1653519 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032]; figure 1 ** paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] *; | [Y]US2006186802 (COK RONALD S [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0051]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE20321614U (CITIZEN ELECTRONICS [JP]) [A] 1-4,6,15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026]; figure 3 *; | [A] - KI YOUNG KO ET AL, "Enhanced Light Extraction from SrGa2S4:Eu2+ Film Phosphors Coated with Various Sizes of Polystyrene Nanosphere Monolayers", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY C, (20080522), vol. 112, no. 20, doi:10.1021/jp800115r, ISSN 1932-7447, pages 7594 - 7598, XP055014210 [A] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0001]; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp800115r | International search | [A]US2005141240 (HATA MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2005224826 (KEUPER MATTHIJS H [US], et al); | [A]US2006124917 (MILLER THOMAS J [US], et al); | [A]KR20080000884 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) |