EP2346837 - METHODS OF PREPARING QUINAZOLINONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Resverlogix Corp. 300, 4820 Richard Road SW Calgary, AB T3E 6L1 / CA | [2015/48] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Resverlogix Corporation 300, 4820 Richard Road SW Calgary, AB T3E 6L1 / CA | ||
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states RESVERLOGIX CORP. 202, 279 Midpark Way S.E. Calgary, Alberta T2X 1M2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Henrik, C. 4903 Carney Road Nw Calgary AB T2L 1E6 / CA | 02 /
CHOPADE, Shubham, P. 2537 Heathway Drive Florence SC 29501 / US | 03 /
CITINENI, Janakiram, R. 3060 Drake Shore Drive Florence SC 29501 / US | 04 /
SHORT, Robert, P. 207 W. Millstone Road Florence SC 29505 / US | 05 /
YIANNIKOUROS, George, P. 1864 Brigadoone Lane Florence SC 29505 / US | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/30] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09770937.2 | 24.06.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009US48457 | Priority number, date | US20080075952P | 26.06.2008 Original published format: US 75952 P | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009158404 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2346837 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2346837 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2346837 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/91 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
C07D239/91 (EP,US);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHINAZOLINONDERIVATEN | [2011/30] | English: | METHODS OF PREPARING QUINAZOLINONE DERIVATIVES | [2011/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE DÉRIVÉS DE QUINAZOLINONE | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 18.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002004608 (ALIG LEO [CH], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0222] *; | [A]WO2006012577 (BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0080] , [0082] *; | [PY]WO2008092231 (RESVERLOGIX CORP [CA], et al) [PY] 1-23* example 7 *; | [Y] - CONNOLLY D J ET AL, "Synthesis of quinazolinones and quinazolines", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 61, no. 43, ISSN 0040-4020, (20051024), pages 10153 - 10202, (20051024), XP025383736 [Y] 1-23 * see 2.12, p. 10162-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2005.07.010 |