EP2403366 - SAFETY HARNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dispersion Technology Limited The Old Casino 28 Fourth Avenue Hove, Sussex BN3 2PJ / GB | [2018/26] |
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Leicester, Gordon Charles Backlands Farm London Road Hickstead Sussex RH17 5LZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEICESTER, Gordon Charles Backlands Farm, London Road Hickstead, Sussex RH17 5LZ / GB | [2018/26] |
Former [2012/02] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [2018/10] |
Former [2012/02] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 09771400.0 | 07.12.2009 | [2018/10] | WO2009GB51656 | Priority number, date | GB20090003534 | 03.03.2009 Original published format: GB 0903534 | [2012/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010100395 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2403366 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2403366 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/00, A62B35/00, // A41F19/00 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
A62B35/0018 (EP,US);
A41D13/0007 (EP,US);
A62B35/00 (EP,US);
A62B35/0025 (EP,US);
A62B35/0037 (EP);
A41F19/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2012/02] | A41D13/00, A62B35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSGURTZEUG | [2012/02] | English: | SAFETY HARNESS | [2012/02] | French: | HARNAIS DE SÉCURITÉ | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.01.2012 | 31.12.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.06.2013 | 31.12.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2009 | AT | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | CZ | 07.03.2018 | DK | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | RO | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | TR | 07.03.2018 | BG | 07.06.2018 | GR | 08.06.2018 | IS | 07.07.2018 | PT | 09.07.2018 | FI | 07.12.2018 | IE | 07.12.2018 | LU | 07.12.2018 | MT | 07.12.2018 | SE | 08.12.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.12.2009 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MK | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
FI | 07.12.2018 | ||
IE | 07.12.2018 | ||
LU | 07.12.2018 | ||
MT | 07.12.2018 | ||
SE | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.12.2009 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
FI | 07.12.2018 | ||
IE | 07.12.2018 | ||
LU | 07.12.2018 | ||
MT | 07.12.2018 | ||
SE | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
FI | 07.12.2018 | ||
IE | 07.12.2018 | ||
LU | 07.12.2018 | ||
MT | 07.12.2018 | ||
SE | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
FI | 07.12.2018 | ||
IE | 07.12.2018 | ||
LU | 07.12.2018 | ||
MT | 07.12.2018 | ||
SE | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
FI | 07.12.2018 | ||
IE | 07.12.2018 | ||
LU | 07.12.2018 | ||
SE | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
FI | 07.12.2018 | ||
LU | 07.12.2018 | ||
SE | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
FI | 07.12.2018 | ||
LU | 07.12.2018 | ||
SE | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
FI | 07.12.2018 | ||
SE | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
FI | 07.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0112267 (FRASER THOMAS EDWARD [NZ], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]DE202008004980U (SHEU JIA PEIR [TW]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | Examination | GB749717 |