EP2352935 - DISK SET ARRANGEMENT FOR A CHAIN CVT HAVING A FUNCTION-OPTIMIZED DISK SET CONTOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2012/11] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDLER, Thomas Hildmannsfelder Strasse 36 77836 Rheinmünster / DE | 02 /
RICKLING, Nicolas 28 rue du Saumon 67850 Offendorf / FR | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/33] | Application number, filing date | 09771487.7 | 29.10.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009DE01533 | Priority number, date | DE20081054327 | 03.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008054327 | DE20091004708 | 15.01.2009 Original published format: DE102009004708 | [2011/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010060406 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2352935 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2352935 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16H9/18, F16H61/662, F16G5/18 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
F16G5/18 (EP,US);
F16H9/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | SCHEIBENSATZANORDNUNG FÜR EIN KETTEN-CVT MIT EINER FUNKTIONSOPTIMIERTEN SCHEIBENSATZKONTUR | [2011/32] | English: | DISK SET ARRANGEMENT FOR A CHAIN CVT HAVING A FUNCTION-OPTIMIZED DISK SET CONTOUR | [2011/32] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'ENSEMBLES DE POULIES POUR UNE TRANSMISSION A VARIATION CONTINUE A CHAINE PRESENTANT UN PROFIL D'ENSEMBLE DE POULIES FONCTIONNELLEMENT OPTIMISE | [2012/21] |
Former [2011/32] | AGENCEMENT D'ENSEMBLES DE POULIES POUR UNE TRANSMISSION À VARIATION CONTINUE À CHAÎNE PRÉSENTANT UN PROFIL D'ENSEMBLE DE POULIES FONCTIONNELLEMENT OPTIMISÉ | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 12.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2009 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | HR | 15.08.2012 | IT | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | MK | 15.08.2012 | MT | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | SM | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | IE | 29.10.2012 | LU | 29.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | FR | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | NO | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | ES | 26.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 29.10.2009 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
SM | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
LU | 29.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
SM | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
LU | 29.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 15.08.2012 | |
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CZ | 15.08.2012 | |
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CZ | 15.08.2012 | |
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 15.08.2012 | |
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 15.08.2012 | |
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CZ | 15.08.2012 | |
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CZ | 15.08.2012 | |
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CZ | 15.08.2012 | |
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CZ | 15.08.2012 | |
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | DK | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | FI | 15.08.2012 | |
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | FI | 15.08.2012 | |
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 15.08.2012 | |
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 15.08.2012 | |
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 15.08.2012 | |
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 15.08.2012 | |
NO | 15.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102005037941 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1441151 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,13 * figures 3,5a *; | [A]JP2002031215 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1,13 * figures 1,9 *; | [A]GB2169043 (REIMERS GETRIEBE AG) [A] 1,13 * figures 3,4,5 *; | [A]WO2007055560 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,13 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE10003131 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1,13 * column 3, line 28 - line 34; figures 2,4 *; | [A]DE10235342 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,13 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2006049493 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,13 * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 2; figure 3 * | by applicant | DE102005037941 |