EP2310403 - NEW BACTERIOPHAGE ADHESION PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomérieux S.A. Chemin de l'Orme 69280 Marcy L'Etoile / FR | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIEBL, Manfred Regerstr. 10 93053 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
GRASSL, Renate Schelmengraben 4e 93059 Regensbrug / DE | 03 /
WALTER, Monika Graf Zeppelinstr. 16 93053 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
MILLER, Stefan Roggenweg 11 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstraße 11 80331 München / DE | [2017/49] |
Former [2011/16] | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09772554.3 | 03.07.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009EP58453 | Priority number, date | EP20080012152 | 04.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08012152 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010000854 | Date: | 07.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2310403 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2310403 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/005, C12N9/24, G01N33/569 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,CN,US);
C12N1/20 (CN);
G01N33/56911 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2319/21 (EP,US);
C07K2319/22 (EP,US);
C07K2319/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2011/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NEUE BAKTERIOPHAGE HAFTPROTEINE | [2017/26] | English: | NEW BACTERIOPHAGE ADHESION PROTEINS | [2011/16] | French: | NOUVELLES PROTÉINES D'ADHÉSION DES BACTÉRIOPHAGES | [2011/16] |
Former [2011/16] | NEUE BAKTERIOPHAGENADHÄSIONSPROTEINE | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 17.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2015/53] | 01.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.06.2017 | 07.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16188008.3 / EP3124492 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.07.2009 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | IT | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | NL | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | IE | 03.07.2018 | LU | 03.07.2018 | MT | 03.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 03.07.2009 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 03.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
MT | 03.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 03.07.2009 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 03.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
MT | 03.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 03.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
MT | 03.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 03.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
MT | 03.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 03.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 03.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 03.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO0109370 (PROFOS GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1-4,6-9,11-12,14,16-17 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, line 1; claims 1,4,6,7 * [I] 5,13,15; | [A]US2004121403 (MILLER STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0028] *; | [A]US2004197833 (LOESSNER MARTIN [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2004248298 (SCHUTZ MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0031] , [0033] , [0035] , [0053] , [0054] *; | [XP]WO2008121830 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA], et al) [XP] 1-4,6-17 *Section. 1.7.4* * page 7, line 3; page 9 lines 26-33; page 10 line 1-2; page 10 line 28; page 12 line 5 *; | [XI] - BAXA U ET AL, "INTERACTIONS OF PHAGE P22 TAILS WITH THEIR CELLULAR RECEPTOR, SALMONELLA O-ANTIGEN POLYSACCHARIDE", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, NEW YORK, US, US, (19961001), vol. 71, no. 4, ISSN 0006-3495, pages 2040 - 2048, XP000613194 [X] 1-4,6-9,17 * page 2043, column 2, paragraph 2 * [I] 10 | [A] - EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 215, no. 3, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 653 - 661, XP002558169 [A] 9-10 * abstract * | Examination | - "SubName: Full=Gp17 {ECO:0000313|EMBL:ACF15825.1};", UniProt, (20080902), Database accession no. B3VCX0, URL: EBI, XP002745367 | - "SubName: Full=Gp06 {ECO:0000313|EMBL:AAT37770.1};", UniProt, (20040705), Database accession no. Q6IWQ5, URL: EBI, XP002745368 | - "RecName: Full=Tail fiber protein {ECO:0000305}; EC=3.2.1.-; AltName: Full=Endorhamnosidase {ECO:0000305}; AltName: Full=Gene product 20 {ECO:0000305}; Short=gp20; AltName: Full=Tail spike protein {ECO:0000305}; Short=TSP;", UniProt, (20030601), Database accession no. Q858F5, URL: EBI, XP002745365 | - "Bacillus licheniformis SJ1904 (ATCC PTA-7992) protein, SEQ ID 7117.", Geneseq, (20090305), Database accession no. AUR71988, URL: EBI, XP002745366 |