EP2310353 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AMINOBIPHENYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | For all designated states Technische Universität München Arcisstrasse 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states Technische Universität München Arcisstrasse 21 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINRICH, Markus Weideweg 11 86316 Friedberg / DE | 02 /
WETZEL, Alexander Ostpreussenstrasse 10 89423 Gundelfingen / DE | 03 /
KEIL, Michael Fontanestr. 4 67251 Freinsheim / DE | 04 /
RACK, Michael Hildastr. 11/1 69214 Eppelheim / DE | 05 /
ZIERKE, Thomas Akazienstr. 12 67459 Böhl-Iggelheim / DE | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09772556.8 | 03.07.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009EP58457 | Priority number, date | EP20080159632 | 03.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08159632 | EP20080166713 | 15.10.2008 Original published format: EP 08166713 | [2011/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010000856 | Date: | 07.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2310353 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/80, C07C211/52, C07C213/08, C07C217/80, C07C221/00, C07C227/16, C07C231/12, C07C233/43, C07C271/18, C07D213/81, C07D213/82, C07C225/22, C07C229/60 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
C07C209/80 (EP,KR,US);
C07C211/52 (EP,KR,US);
C07C213/08 (EP,US);
C07C217/80 (EP,US);
C07C221/00 (EP,US);
C07C227/16 (EP,US);
C07C231/02 (KR);
C07C231/12 (EP,US);
C07C233/43 (EP,US);
C07C233/75 (KR);
C07C271/18 (EP,US);
C07D213/81 (EP,US);
C07D213/82 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C213/08, C07C217/84 (EP,US);
C07C221/00, C07C225/22 (US,EP);
C07C227/16, C07C229/60 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMINOBIPHENYLEN | [2011/16] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AMINOBIPHENYLENE | [2011/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D AMINOBIPHÉNYLES | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 04.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 11.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1512753 (YORKSHIRE CHEMICALS LTD) [X] 37,39 * page 2, lines 12-16,20 *; | [X]EP0545099 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 37-40 * page 16, line 38 - line 53 * * pages 17-19; table 3 * * page 17; compound 3.16 *; | [X]WO9708148 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 37-40 * page 21, line 16 - page 22, line 15 *; | [X]WO0003743 (MITOTIX INC [US], et al) [X] 37 * Schema 47, Verbinding 46 *; | [X]WO2004082677 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK], et al) [X] 37 * page 105, line 7 *; | [X]WO2007138089 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 37-40 * page 9, lines 15-17 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 19 * * example 2 *; | [X] - ALLAN, ZDENEK J. ET AL, "Aromatic diazocompounds. XIV. C-phenylation of p-phenylenediamine and the mechanism of nuclear arylation", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1955:8143, URL: STN, XP002504739 [X] 1-36 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICKE LISTY PRO VEDU A PRUMYSL, 48, 52-60 CODEN: CLPRAN; ISSN: 0366-6832, (1954), XP008098841 [ ] * Seite 55, unteres Schema: VIII + IX -> XIII * | [X] - HOLLINGSWORTH, B. L. ET AL, "Some .alpha., .omega.-di(phenanthridin-6-yl)alkanes", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY 3664-7 CODEN: JCSOA9; ISSN: 0368-1769, (1961), XP002544311 [X] 37 * page 3666; table 1; compound 16 * | [A] - ALLAN, Z. J. ET AL, "Aromatic diazo compounds. VIII. Coupling with benzidine", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1953:51461, URL: STN, XP002504740 [A] 1,4,5,37,40 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICKE LISTY PRO VEDU A PRUMYSL, 46, 485-6 CODEN: CLPRAN; ISSN: 0366-6832, (1952), XP008098840 | [A] - JENSEN A E ET AL, "Preparation of 2-arylated-1,4-phenylenediamines by palladium-catalyzed cross-coupling reactions", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (20020701), vol. 653, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-328X, pages 122 - 128, XP004361513 [A] 1,4,5,37,40 * Seiten 123 und 124: Schemata 3 und 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-328X(02)01156-7 | [PX] - WETZEL, ALEXANDER ET AL, "Synthesis of amino- and hydroxybiphenyls by radical chain reaction of arenediazonium salts", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION , 47(47), 9130-9133 CODEN: ACIEF5; ISSN: 1433-7851, (2008), XP002544312 [PX] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ANIE.200803785 | by applicant | - ZDENEK J. ALLAN; FERDINAND MUZIK, ORGANIC-TECHNOLOGICAL LABORATORY I | - NORRIS J.F.; MACINTIRE G.B.; CORSE W.M., AM. CHEM. J., (1903), vol. 29, page 120 | - CHEM. ZENTR., (1903), vol. I, page 705 | - MARINI-BETTOLO G.B.; POLA O.A.; ABRIL J.H., GAZZ. CHIM. ITAL., (1950), vol. 80, page 76 | - CHEM. LISTY, (1951), vol. 45, page 1534 | - DOBáS J., CHEM. LISTY, (1952), vol. 46, page 277 | - ALLAN Z.J.; MUZIK F., CHEM. LISTY, (1952), vol. 46, page 485 | - HIRSCH R., BER., (1890), vol. 23, page 3705 | - DRP 58001, vol. 3, page 51 | - KüHLING O., BER., (1896), vol. 29, page 165 | - GRIEVE W.S.M.; HEY D.H., J. CHEM. SOC., (1934), page 1797 | - CHEM. ZENTR., (1935), vol. I, page 1861 | - HEY D.H.; WATERS W.A., CHEM. REVS., (1937), vol. 21, page 169 | - HUISGEN R.; HORELD G., ANN., (1949), vol. 562, page 137 | - PFEIL E.; VELDEN 0., ANN., (1949), vol. 565, page 183 | - GOLDSCHMIDT H.; BüRKLE E., BER., (1899), vol. 32, page 355 | - WISTAR R.; BARTLETT P.D., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1941), vol. 63, page 413 | - TICHVINSKIJ M., Z. RUSS. FIZ. CHIM. OBSC., (1903), vol. 35, page 667 | - CHEM. ZENTR., (1903), vol. II, page 1270 | - VAN LOON M.J.P., REC. TRAV. CHIM., (1904), vol. 23, page 62 | - HAMMOND G.S.; SHINE H.J., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1950), vol. 72, page 220 | - JACOBSON P., ANN., (1922), vol. 428, page 76 | - INGOLD C.K.; KIDD H.V., J. CHEM. SOC., (1933), page 984 | - ROBINSON R., J. CHEM. SOC., (1941), page 202 | - HUGHES E.D.; INGOLD C.K., J. CHEM. SOC., (1941), page 606 | - QUARTERLY REVS., (1952), vol. 6, page 53 | - DEWAR M.J.S., NATURE, (1945), vol. 176, page 784 | - J. CHEM. SOC., (1946), page 406777 | - 0RELKIN B.P.; RYSKAL'CUK A.T.; AJZIKOVIC M.A., Z. OBSC. CHIM., (1931), vol. 1, page 698 | - SCHOUTISSEN H.A.J., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1933), vol. 55, page 4541 | - ELKS J.; HAWORTH J.W.; HEY D.H., J. CHEM. SOC., (1940), page 1284 | - HAWORTH J.W.; HEILBRON I.M.; HEY D.H., J. CHEM. SOC., (1940), page 349 | - MEERWEIN H.; BüCHNER E.; VAN EMSTER K., J. PRAKT. CHEM., (1939), vol. 152, page 237 | - HüCKEL E., Z. ELEKTROCHEM., (1937), vol. 43, page 752 | - POWEL H.M.; HUSE G.; COOKE P.W., J. CHEM. SOC., (1943), page 153 | - ZORINOVá M.D., ZAVODSKAJA LAB., (1947), vol. 13, page 1180 | - CHEM. ABSTR., (1949), vol. 43, page 4185 | - CHEM. LISTY, (1954), vol. 48, page 52 |