EP2308036 - METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF UNIQUE LABEL TO BE STORED BY OPTICAL DEVICES, AND USE THEREOF IN THE ANTICOUNTERFEITING AND IN THE IDENTIFICATION OF PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/15] | UNIVOCAL LABEL TO BE STORED BY OPTICAL DEVICES, METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF THE SAME AND USE THEREOF IN THE ANTICOUNTERFEITING AND IN THE IDENTIFICATION OF PRODUCTS | ||
[2016/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SELVA, Claudio Via Cascina L'Ottaviana n.18 13900 Biella Pavignano (BI) / IT | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Sarpi, Maurizio, et al Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | [2017/17] |
Former [2011/15] | Sarpi, Maurizio, et al Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 09772866.1 | 14.01.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009IB00062 | Priority number, date | IT2008BI00010 | 04.07.2008 Original published format: IT BI20080010 | IT2008BI00015 | 13.08.2008 Original published format: IT BI20080015 | [2011/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010001203 | Date: | 07.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2308036 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2308036 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/00, G06K19/06, G09F3/02 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
G06K19/06 (KR);
G09F3/0291 (US);
B42D25/47 (US);
G06K19/086 (EP,US);
G09F3/00 (EP,US);
G09F3/02 (KR);
G09F3/0292 (EP,US);
B42D2033/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/17] |
Former [2011/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 25.01.2011 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZU EINER HERSTELLUNG EINES EINDEUTIGES LABEL ZUR SPEICHERUNG DURCH OPTISCHE ANORDNUNGEN UND VERWENDUNG DAFÜR BEI DER FÄLSCHUNGSSICHERUNG UND IDENTIFIKATION VON PRODUKTEN | [2016/47] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF UNIQUE LABEL TO BE STORED BY OPTICAL DEVICES, AND USE THEREOF IN THE ANTICOUNTERFEITING AND IN THE IDENTIFICATION OF PRODUCTS | [2016/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE ETIQUETTE DIFFERENCIEE DESTINEE A ETRE STOCKEE PAR DES DISPOSITIFS OPTIQUES, ET UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI DANS LA LUTTE CONTRE LA CONTREFAÇON ET DANS L'IDENTIFICATION DE PRODUITS | [2016/47] |
Former [2011/15] | EINDEUTIGES LABEL ZUR SPEICHERUNG DURCH OPTISCHE ANORDNUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAFÜR BEI DER FÄLSCHUNGSSICHERUNG UND IDENTIFIKATION VON PRODUKTEN | ||
Former [2011/15] | UNIVOCAL LABEL TO BE STORED BY OPTICAL DEVICES, METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF THE SAME AND USE THEREOF IN THE ANTICOUNTERFEITING AND IN THE IDENTIFICATION OF PRODUCTS | ||
Former [2011/15] | ETIQUETTE DIFFERENCIEE DESTINEE A ETRE STOCKEE PAR DES DISPOSITIFS OPTIQUES, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CELLE-CI ET UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI DANS LA LUTTE CONTRE LA CONTREFAÇON ET DANS L'IDENTIFICATION DE PRODUITS | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 30.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2009 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | IT | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | NL | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | IE | 14.01.2018 | LU | 14.01.2018 | MT | 14.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 14.01.2009 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
MT | 14.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
MT | 14.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
MT | 14.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 26.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2001041214 (BROGGER BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0036] , [0051] , [0052]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US7038766 (KERNS WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US7055691 (SAFIAN JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | Examination | US2007291988 | by applicant | US2001041214 | US7038766 |