EP2356448 - BIOCOMPATIBLE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Of Bath Research and Innovation Services Norwood House Claverton Down Bath BA2 7AY / GB | For all designated states King's College London Strand London WC2R 2LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states University Of Bath Research and Innovation Services Norwood House Claverton Down Bath BA2 7AY / GB | ||
For all designated states King's College London Strand London WC2R 2LS / GB | |||
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states The University of Bath Research and Innovation Services Norwood House University of Bath Claverton Down, Bath BA2 7AY / GB | ||
For all designated states KINGS COLLEGE LONDON The Strand London WC2R 2LS / GB | |||
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states The University of Bath Research and Innovation Services Norwood House University of Bath Claverton Down, Bath BA2 7AY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAHAM, Anthony, H., D. Department of Electronic&Electrical Engineering University of Bath Bath BA2 7AY / GB | 02 /
TAYLOR, John Department of Electronic&Electrical Engineering University of Bath Bath BA2 7AY / GB | 03 /
BOWEN, Chris, R. Department of Mechanical Engineering University of Bath Bath BA2 / GB | 04 /
ROBBINS, Jon Receptors&Signalling Wolfson Card King's College London London SE1 1UL / GB | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Bollinghaus, Emer, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09774688.7 | 10.11.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009GB02641 | Priority number, date | GB20080020629 | 11.11.2008 Original published format: GB 0820629 | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010055287 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2356448 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, A61B5/04, A61B5/0492, A61N1/05 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
A61N1/0551 (EP,US);
A61B5/24 (EP,US);
G01N33/4836 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | BIOKOMPATIBLE ELEKTRODE | [2011/33] | English: | BIOCOMPATIBLE ELECTRODE | [2011/33] | French: | ÉLECTRODE BIOCOMPATIBLE | [2011/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 14.02.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 23.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 29.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/44] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 23.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2012 | Decision despatched | 23.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2014 | 30.11.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4542579 (POPONIAK MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 15* the whole document *; | [X]WO9965388 (MANN ALFRED E FOUND SCIENT RES [US]) [X] 1 * page 3 - page 5 *; | [A]JP2004147845 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US7127301 (OKANDAN MURAT [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * claims 1-6,39,40,41 *; | [Y]WO2007015878 (UNIV LOUISVILLE RES FOUND [US], et al) [Y] 12,28 * abstract *; | [X]US2007187840 (DELL ACQUA-BELLAVITIS LUDOVICO [US], et al) [X] 27 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009] *; | [XY]US2008077194 (GREENBERG ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-11,13-14 * figures 8(a)-8(c); claims 1-20 * [Y] 12,28; | [A]US2008102096 (MOLIN RENZO D [FR], et al) [A] 1-31 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0040] * |