EP2304023 - PLATELET FRACTION DERIVING FROM PLACENTAL BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FONDAZIONE IRCCS ''CA' GRANDA - OSPEDALE MAGGIORE POLICLINICO'' Via Francesco Sforza, 28 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states FONDAZIONE IRCCS ''CA' GRANDA - OSPEDALE MAGGIORE POLICLINICO'' Via Francesco Sforza, 28 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states FONDAZIONE IRCCS ''CA' GRANDA - OSPEDALE MAGGIORE POLICLINICO'' Via Francesco Sforza, 28 20122 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REBULLA, Paolo Via Mac Mahon 7 I-20154 Milano / IT | 02 /
LAZZARI, Lorenza Viale Regina Giovanna 25 20129 Milano / IT | 03 /
PARAZZI, Valentina Largo Usuelli Celestino 1 20133 Milano / IT | 04 /
GREPPI, Noemi Via Romilli Arcivescovo 13 20139 Milano / IT | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Biggi, Cristina Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Biggi, Cristina c/o Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2011/14] | Biggi, Cristina C/o Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09774697.8 | 14.07.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009IB06239 | Priority number, date | IT2008MI01316 | 18.07.2008 Original published format: IT MI20081316 | [2011/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010007502 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2304023 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2304023 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/02, A61K35/16, A61P7/00, A61P17/02 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
C12N5/0018 (EP,US);
A61K35/19 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C12N5/0037 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2011/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | THROMBOZYTENFRAKTION AUS PLAZENTABLUT | [2011/14] | English: | PLATELET FRACTION DERIVING FROM PLACENTAL BLOOD | [2011/14] | French: | FRACTION PLAQUETTAIRE DÉRIVÉE DE SANG PLACENTAIRE | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 06.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2009 | AT | 01.07.2015 | BE | 01.07.2015 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | DK | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | HR | 01.07.2015 | LT | 01.07.2015 | LV | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | MK | 01.07.2015 | MT | 01.07.2015 | NL | 01.07.2015 | RO | 01.07.2015 | SE | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | SM | 01.07.2015 | IE | 14.07.2015 | LU | 14.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | NO | 01.10.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | IS | 01.11.2015 | PT | 02.11.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
BG | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
BG | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 01.07.2015 | |
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 01.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2004076637 (MARINEPOLYMER TECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 12-15* claim - *; | [Y]WO2005065269 (AM BIOSOLUTIONS [US], et al) [Y] 12-13,16-17 * paragraphs [0045] , [0047] , [0068] , [0072]; example - *; | [XYI] - FOLEY M E & MCNICOL G P, "An in-vitro study of acidosis, platelet function, and perinatal cerebral intraventricular haemorrhage.", LANCET, (19770611), vol. 1, no. 8024, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 1230 - 1232, XP002530661 [X] 1-2,8-10 * the whole document * [Y] 12-17 [I] 3-7,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(77)92438-2 | Examination | - MROWIEC Z R ET AL, "A Novel Technique for Preparing Improved Buffy Coat Platelet Concentrates", BLOOD CELLS, MOLECULES, AND DISEASES, (199504), vol. 21, no. 1, doi:10.1006/bcmd.1995.0005, ISSN 1079-9796, pages 25 - 33, XP055124538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bcmd.1995.0005 | - BAGAMERY K ET AL, "Flow cytometric analysis of CD41-labeled platelets isolated by the rapid, one-step OptiPrep method from human blood", CYTOMETRY PART A, (200505), vol. 65A, no. 1, doi:10.1002/cyto.a.20133, ISSN 1552-4922, pages 84 - 87, XP055124539 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.a.20133 | - BAUSSET O ET AL, "Formulation and Storage of Platelet-Rich Plasma Homemade Product", BIORESEARCH OPEN ACCESS, (201206), vol. 1, no. 3, doi:10.1089/biores.2012.0225, ISSN 2164-7860, pages 115 - 123, XP055124541 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/biores.2012.0225 |