EP2358699 - ISOTHIAZOLE AND PYRAZOLE DERIVATIVES FOR USE AS PLANT GROWTH REGULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORSI, Camilla Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhauserstrasse CH-4332 Stein / CH | 02 /
WENDEBORN, Sebastian Volker Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhauserstrasse CH-4332 Stein / CH | 03 /
BOBBIO, Carla Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhauserstrasse CH-4332 Stein / CH | 04 /
KESSABI, Jilali Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhauserstrasse CH-4332 Stein / CH | 05 /
SCHNEITER, Peter Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhauserstrasse CH-4332 Stein / CH | 06 /
GRASSO, Valeria Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhauserstrasse CH-4332 Stein / CH | 07 /
HAAS, Ulrich Johannes Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhauserstrasse CH-4332 Stein / CH | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | SYNGENTA IP WRO B8-Z1-30 Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Syngenta International AG WRO 1008-Z1-26 Schwarzwaldalle 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2011/34] | Herrmann, Jörg Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Intellectual Property Department Schaffhauserstrasse 4332 Stein / CH | Application number, filing date | 09774897.4 | 11.12.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009EP66956 | Priority number, date | GB20080023000 | 17.12.2008 Original published format: GB 0823000 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010069877 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2358699 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D407/14, C07D409/14, C07D411/06, C07D411/14 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Title | German: | ISOTHIAZOL- UND PYRAZOLDERIVATE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS PFLANZENWACHSTUMSREGULATOREN | [2011/34] | English: | ISOTHIAZOLE AND PYRAZOLE DERIVATIVES FOR USE AS PLANT GROWTH REGULATORS | [2011/34] | French: | DERIVES D'ISOTHIAZOLE ET DE PYRAZOLE UTILISES COMME REGULATEURS DE LA CROISSANCE VEGETALE | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 14.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 29.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4144047 (FRANZ JOHN E, et al) [A] 1-22 * claims 1-2 *; | [A]WO0187863 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-22 * claims 1, 12 *; | [A]WO0230907 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-22 * claim 1 *; | [XP]WO2009007098 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [XP] 1-22 * claims 1-18 * |