EP2371125 - A DISPLAY SYSTEM, CONTROL UNIT, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR PROVIDING AMBIENT LIGHT WITH 3D SENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TP Vision Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUYNEEL, Filip, Marcel, Denise c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HOEBEECK, Christophe c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
SEYNAEVE, Dirck c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
PEETERS, Alfred c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
SEUNTIENS, Pieter, Johannes, Hendrikus c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
VERBERNE, Michael c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
ZUO, Fei c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 08 /
HOOGENSTRAATEN, Willem, Franciscus, Johannes c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 09 /
KWISTHOUT, Cornelis, Wilhelmus c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/41] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2011/40] | Coops, Peter, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09774946.9 | 24.11.2009 | WO2009IB55313 | Priority number, date | EP20080170174 | 28.11.2008 Original published format: EP 08170174 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010061334 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2371125 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H05B37/02 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H04N5/66 (EP,KR,US);
H05B45/10 (KR);
H05B45/20 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANZEIGESYSTEM, STEUEREINHEIT, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUM VERSEHEN VON UMGEBUNGSLICHT MIT 3D-ERLEBNIS | [2011/40] | English: | A DISPLAY SYSTEM, CONTROL UNIT, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR PROVIDING AMBIENT LIGHT WITH 3D SENSATION | [2011/40] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE, UNITÉ DE COMMANDE, PROCÉDÉ ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR PRODUIRE UNE LUMIÈRE AMBIANTE À SENSATION 3D | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 10.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6611297 (AKASHI YUKIO [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * Room divided in 3 ambient zones; column 17, lines 14-22; figure 4 * * 2 sources of Ambient light are guided by foreground resp. background of image 6A(d); column 20, line 64 - column 21, line 32; figures 6A(c)-6A(d) * * figure 5C *; | [XYI]WO2007113754 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,10-14 * page 1, lines 4-5 * * page 3, lines 9-15 * * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 8 * * First embodiment. SEI messages distinguish foreground object from background to guide ambient lighting.; page 13, lines 25-27 * * ambient light based on color; page 13, lines 13-16 * * page 14, line 18 - page 19, line 7 * * page 16, lines 15-22 * * Depth information used for ambient lighting (independant claim 1). Cl. 11 ambient light based on subsequent images.; page 16, lines 19-30 * * Cl. 7, Ambient light based on light source's spatial location.; page 18, line 12 - page 19, line 10 * [Y] 4,8-9 [I] 2; | [YA]US2008094515 (GUTTA SRINIVAS [IN], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0094] * * figure 1 * [A] 1-8,10-14; | [XP]WO2009027923 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [XP] 1,12-14 * page 1, lines 2-5 * * page 2, lines 4-9 ** page 10, line 20 - line 28 *; | [Y] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Usage of SEI in H.264", 3GPP DRAFT; S4-060396, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060821), vol. SA WG4, no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20060821, XP050288705 [Y] 8 * page 1, paragraph 2 * |