EP2373837 - PADDING FOR A CARPET AND CARPET-PADDING COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2014/09] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN HERPEN, Maarten, M., J., W. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/41] | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09774977.4 | 01.12.2009 | WO2009IB55440 | Priority number, date | EP20080170727 | 04.12.2008 Original published format: EP 08170727 | [2011/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010064192 | Date: | 10.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2373837 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2373837 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D05C17/02, F21V33/00, G08B5/36 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
D05C17/023 (EP,US);
A47G27/02 (KR);
D05C17/02 (KR);
F21V33/00 (KR);
F21V33/006 (EP,US);
G02B6/001 (EP,US);
G08B5/36 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEPPISCHPOLSTERUNG UND TEPPISCH-POLSTERUNGSKOMBINATION | [2013/28] | English: | PADDING FOR A CARPET AND CARPET-PADDING COMBINATION | [2011/41] | French: | REMBOURRAGE POUR UN TAPIS ET COMBINAISON TAPIS-REMBOURRAGE | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/41] | POLSTERUNG FÜR TEPPICH UND KOMBINATION TEPPICH/POLSTERUNG | ||
Former [2011/41] | REMBOURRAGE POUR TAPIS ET COMBINAISON TAPIS - REMBOURRAGE | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Request for further processing for: | 12.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2009 | AT | 26.02.2014 | BE | 26.02.2014 | BG | 26.02.2014 | CY | 26.02.2014 | CZ | 26.02.2014 | DK | 26.02.2014 | EE | 26.02.2014 | ES | 26.02.2014 | FI | 26.02.2014 | HR | 26.02.2014 | IT | 26.02.2014 | LT | 26.02.2014 | LV | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | MK | 26.02.2014 | MT | 26.02.2014 | NL | 26.02.2014 | PL | 26.02.2014 | RO | 26.02.2014 | SE | 26.02.2014 | SI | 26.02.2014 | SK | 26.02.2014 | SM | 26.02.2014 | TR | 26.02.2014 | NO | 26.05.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | IS | 26.06.2014 | PT | 26.06.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 01.12.2009 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 01.12.2009 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.02.2014 | |
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH084268 (SHOWA ELECTRIC WIRE & CABLE CO) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0261811 (COLLINS & AIKMAN CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 6 - column 6, line 7; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US4737764 (HARRISON JOHN M [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 20 - column 6, line 9; figures 1-31 *; | [A]CN201042082Y (FAN ZHANG [CN]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-2 *; | [A]CN101134111 (GUANGZHOU YIPENG ELECTRICAL PR [CN]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN1806723 (WANG TONGYU [CN]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2005034611 (BESUTEKKU KK) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0259051 (COOPER IND INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 30 - column 6, line 43 * | by applicant | US2007037462 | WO2007033980 | US2006082987 | US4754372 | US4794373 |