EP2381948 - Compounds for enhancing erythropoiesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/44] | COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING ERYTHROPOIESIS | ||
[2014/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wu, Sophia Shu Fen 426 Park Avenue Yonkers, NY 10703 / US | For all designated states Wu, Rong-Tsun No. 155, Sec. 2 Linong Street Taipei 112 / TW | [2015/13] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Wu, Sophia Shu Fen 426 Park Avenue Yonkers, NY 10703 / US | ||
For all designated states Wu, Rong-Tsun No. 155, Sec. 2 Linong Street Taipei 112 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Rong-Tsun No. 155, Sec. 2 Linong Street Taipei 112 / TW | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/33] | Becker Kurig Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/44] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstraße 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09775516.9 | 21.12.2009 | WO2009US68957 | Priority number, date | US20080343922 | 24.12.2008 Original published format: US 343922 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010075263 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2381948 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2381948 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7034, A61P7/06, A61P13/12, A61P25/00, A61P9/00, A61P9/10, A61P1/16, A61P11/00, A61P1/00, A61P19/08, A61P19/02, A61P21/00, A61P17/00, A61P43/00, A61P37/08 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/7034 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07H15/203 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbindungen zur Verstärkung der Erythropoese | [2014/40] | English: | Compounds for enhancing erythropoiesis | [2014/40] | French: | Composés pour l'amplification de l'érythropoïèse | [2014/40] |
Former [2011/44] | VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG DER ERYTHROPOESE | ||
Former [2011/44] | COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING ERYTHROPOIESIS | ||
Former [2011/44] | COMPOSÉS ET MÉTHODE D'AMPLIFICATION DE L'ÉRYTHROPOÏÈSE | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 30.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14176172.6 / EP2893930 | EP19206081.2 / EP3628321 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2009 | AT | 25.03.2015 | BE | 25.03.2015 | BG | 25.03.2015 | CY | 25.03.2015 | CZ | 25.03.2015 | DK | 25.03.2015 | EE | 25.03.2015 | ES | 25.03.2015 | FI | 25.03.2015 | HR | 25.03.2015 | IT | 25.03.2015 | LT | 25.03.2015 | LV | 25.03.2015 | MC | 25.03.2015 | MK | 25.03.2015 | MT | 25.03.2015 | NL | 25.03.2015 | PL | 25.03.2015 | RO | 25.03.2015 | SE | 25.03.2015 | SI | 25.03.2015 | SK | 25.03.2015 | SM | 25.03.2015 | TR | 25.03.2015 | NO | 25.06.2015 | GR | 26.06.2015 | IS | 25.07.2015 | PT | 27.07.2015 | IE | 21.12.2015 | LU | 21.12.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 21.12.2009 | |
AT | 25.03.2015 | ||
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
TR | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]CN1303858 ; | [XD]US2005042314 (WU RONG-TSUN [TW]) [XD] 1-6,9,10 * claims 1, 8-9 * * example 10 * * paragraph [0017] *; | [A] - ZHANG WEI ET AL, "Treatment with 2,3,4',5-tetrahydroxystilbene-2-O-.beta.-D-glucoside in atherosclerosis in rats", ZHONGGUO YAOKE DAXUE XUEBAO - JOURNAL OF CHINA PHARMACEUTICAL UNIVERSITY, NANJING, CN, (20070101), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 1000-5048, pages 261 - 264, XP008119057 [A] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * | [A] - JIA XIN ET AL, "Neuroprotective effect of tetrahydroxystilbene glucoside on the rat model of Parkinson 's disease", ZHONGGUO XIN YAO ZAZHI - CHINESE NEW DRUGS JOURNAL, GAI-KAN BIANJIBU, BEIJING, CN, (20080101), vol. 17, no. 9, ISSN 1003-3734, pages 748 - 752, XP008119058 [A] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 63, Database accession no. 2001-558353, XP002569662 & CN1303858 A 20010718 (NO 2 MILITARY MEDICAL COLLEGE PLA) [A] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * | [AD] - WANG ET AL, "Protective effects of 2,3,5,4'-tetrahydroxystilbene-2-O-beta-d-gluco side, an active component of Polygonum multiflorum Thunb, on experimental colitis in mice", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20071025), vol. 578, no. 2-3, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 339 - 348, XP022405039 [AD] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * * page 340, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejphar.2007.09.013 | [A] - KIMURA Y ET AL, "EFFECTS OF NATURALLY OCCURRING STILBENE GLUCOSIDES FROM MEDICINAL PLANTS AND WINE, ON TUNOUR GROWTH AND LUNG METASTASIS IN LEWIS LUNG CARCINOMA-BEARING MICE", JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACOLOGY, ROYAL PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN, GB, (20001001), vol. 10, no. 52, ISSN 0022-3573, pages 1287 - 1295, XP001069866 [A] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1211/0022357001777270 | Examination | - S. Nurko, "Anemia in chronic kidney disease: causes, diagnosis, treatment.", Cleveland Clinic Journal of Medicine, (20060301), vol. 73, no. 3, doi:10.3949/ccjm.73.3.289, ISSN 0891-1150, pages 289 - 297, XP055099863 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3949/ccjm.73.3.289 | - T Stopka ET AL, "Human Hematopoietic Progenitors Express Erythropoietin", Blood, UNITED STATES, (19980515), pages 3766 - 3772, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/9573013, (20140821), XP055135874 |