EP2310116 - DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUSLY MIXING FED-OUT NATURAL GAS WITH OXYGEN TO PRODUCE A BURNABLE GAS FOR HEATING PRESSURIZED NATURAL GAS BEFORE OR AFTER THE EXPANSION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EWE GASSPEICHER GmbH Moslestrasse 7 26122 Oldenburg / DE | [2013/03] |
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states EWE ENERGIE AG Tirpitzstrasse 39 26122 Oldenburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states EWE Aktiengesellschaft Tirpitzstrasse 39 26122 Oldenburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Rohr- Und Maschinenanlagentechnik GmbH Ammerländer Heerstrasse 368 26129 Oldenburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENK, Andreas Zum Sportplatz 10a 26203 Wardenburg / DE | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Siekmann, Gunnar, et al Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85 26131 Oldenburg / DE | [2011/16] | Application number, filing date | 09775871.8 | 12.05.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009DE00666 | Priority number, date | DE20081036269 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008036269 | [2011/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010015215 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2310116 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2310116 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/02, B01F5/06 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
F23K5/002 (EP,US);
B01F23/10 (EP,US);
B01F25/4524 (EP,US);
B01F25/45241 (EP,US);
F23K2400/20 (EP,US);
Y10T137/4259 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN MISCHEN VON AUSGESPEICHERTEM ERDGAS MIT SAUERSTOFF ZU EINEM BRENNGAS FÜR EINE ERWÄRMUNG DES UNTER DRUCK STEHENDEN ERDGASES VOR ODER NACH SEINER ENTSPANNUNG | [2011/16] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUSLY MIXING FED-OUT NATURAL GAS WITH OXYGEN TO PRODUCE A BURNABLE GAS FOR HEATING PRESSURIZED NATURAL GAS BEFORE OR AFTER THE EXPANSION THEREOF | [2011/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE MÉLANGE CONTINU DE GAZ NATUREL DÉSTOCKÉ AVEC DE L'OXYGÈNE POUR FORMER UN GAZ COMBUSTIBLE SERVANT À CHAUFFER LE GAZ NATUREL SOUS PRESSION AVANT OU APRÈS SA DÉTENTE | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 06.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | CZ | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | HR | 17.12.2014 | LT | 17.12.2014 | LV | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | MK | 17.12.2014 | MT | 17.12.2014 | SE | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SK | 17.12.2014 | TR | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.03.2015 | IS | 17.04.2015 | IE | 12.05.2015 | LU | 12.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | BG | 17.12.2014 | |
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
TR | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | HR | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 17.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005095185 (GARY DANIEL [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005095186 (MCGEE KENNETH S [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3330773 (HART JR JOHN W DE) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0920578 (EWE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |