EP2315686 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A CRITERION OF THE SEVERITY OF AN ACCIDENT BY MEANS OF AN ACCELERATION SIGNAL AND A SOLID-BORNE SOUND SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2011/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FESER, Michael Ficherweg 18 93092 Barbing / DE | 02 /
SMYKALLA, Christian Goldene-Bären-Strasse 12 93047 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
FORSTER, Andreas Lerchenhaube 14 93086 Wörth / DE | 04 /
GEISSLER, Udo Ringstrasse 24 63825 Blankenbach / DE | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Büchner, Jörg Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Patente & Lizenzen Sieboldstraße 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Büchner, Jörg Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Patente & Lizenzen Sieboldstraße 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09775882.5 | 27.05.2009 | [2011/18] | WO2009DE00754 | Priority number, date | DE20081039957 | 27.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008039957 | [2011/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010022692 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2315686 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2315686 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/0136, B60R21/013 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
B60R21/0132 (EP,US);
B60R21/0136 (KR);
B60R21/01332 (EP,US);
B60R21/013 (KR);
B60R21/0133 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01302 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG EINES UNFALLSCHWEREKRITERIUMS MITTELS EINES BESCHLEUNIGUNGSSIGNALS UND EINES KÖRPERSCHALLSIGNALS | [2011/18] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A CRITERION OF THE SEVERITY OF AN ACCIDENT BY MEANS OF AN ACCELERATION SIGNAL AND A SOLID-BORNE SOUND SIGNAL | [2011/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER UN CRITÈRE DE GRAVITÉ D'UN ACCIDENT À L'AIDE D'UN SIGNAL D'ACCÉLÉRATION ET D'UN SIGNAL DE BRUIT DE STRUCTURE | [2011/18] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 28.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2009 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | HR | 25.12.2013 | IT | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | LV | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | MK | 25.12.2013 | MT | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | NO | 25.03.2014 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | AT | 27.05.2014 | GB | 27.05.2014 | IE | 27.05.2014 | LU | 27.05.2014 | BE | 31.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 27.05.2009 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
AT | 27.05.2014 | ||
GB | 27.05.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.05.2009 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
AT | 27.05.2014 | ||
GB | 27.05.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
AT | 27.05.2014 | ||
GB | 27.05.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
AT | 27.05.2014 | ||
GB | 27.05.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
AT | 27.05.2014 | ||
GB | 27.05.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
AT | 27.05.2014 | ||
GB | 27.05.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
GB | 27.05.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | |
NO | 25.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0904989 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US7278657 (MCCURDY ROGER A [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |