EP2337922 - DRILLING RIG AND MOUNTING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max Streicher GmbH & Co. KGaA Schwaigerbreite 17 94469 Deggendorf / DE | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Max Streicher Gmbh & Co. Kg AA Schwaigerbreite 17 94469 Deggendorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECK, Andreas Sudetendeutsche Strasse 53 94327 Bogen / DE | 02 /
KERSCHL, Christian Nordweg 11 94469 Deggendorf / DE | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
BECK, Andreas Suddetendeutsche Strasse 53 94327 Bogen / DE | ||
02 /
KERSCHL, Christian Nordweg 11 94469 Deggendorf / DE | Representative(s) | Fischbeck, Jörn Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 D-80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Fischbeck, Jörn Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/26] | Fischbeck, Jörn Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09776077.1 | 10.08.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009DE01124 | Priority number, date | DE20081038391 | 20.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008038391 | [2011/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010020215 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2337922 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2337922 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E21B15/00 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
E21B15/02 (EP,US);
E21B7/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Title | German: | BOHRANLAGE UND MONTAGEVERFAHREN FÜR DIESE | [2011/26] | English: | DRILLING RIG AND MOUNTING METHOD THEREFOR | [2011/26] | French: | INSTALLATION DE FORAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 16.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2009 | CY | 24.10.2012 | CZ | 24.10.2012 | DK | 24.10.2012 | EE | 24.10.2012 | FI | 24.10.2012 | HR | 24.10.2012 | LT | 24.10.2012 | LV | 24.10.2012 | MC | 24.10.2012 | MK | 24.10.2012 | MT | 24.10.2012 | PL | 24.10.2012 | RO | 24.10.2012 | SE | 24.10.2012 | SI | 24.10.2012 | SK | 24.10.2012 | SM | 24.10.2012 | TR | 24.10.2012 | BG | 24.01.2013 | GR | 25.01.2013 | ES | 04.02.2013 | IS | 24.02.2013 | PT | 25.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
MK | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 24.10.2012 | |
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 24.10.2012 | |
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 24.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4203576 (SUTTON JOHN R [US]) [Y] 2,9 * column 6, line 3 - line 15; figures 2,7 *; | [X]US5450695 (DESAI VINOD [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 5, line 21 - line 55; figures 1-2,7-12 *; | [Y]WO0149966 (MARITIME HYDRAULICS AS [NO], et al) [Y] 10-12 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 26; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2822890 (CAMMELL LAIRD MARSEILLE [FR]) [A] 1-12* column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 6; figures 1-5 *; | [XYI]WO2008012482 (PSL ENERGY SERVICES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,6 * page 11, line 10 - page 17, line 20; figures 3-6 * [Y] 2,9-12 [I] 3-5,7-8 |