EP2303902 - BIS(PERFLUORALKYL)PHOSPHINOUS ACIDS AND DERIVATES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOGE, Berthold Bodelschwinghstrasse 85 33604 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
BADER, Anne Julia Gruenewaldstrasse 10 33615 Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
KURSCHEID, Boris Stralsunder Strasse 21 51145 Koeln / DE | 04 /
IGNATYEV, Nikolai (Mykola) Prinzenstrasse 104 47058 Duisburg / DE | 05 /
AUST, Emil Ferdinand Am Jungstueck 15 55130 Mainz / DE | [2011/20] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
HOGE, Berthold Bodelschwinghstrasse 85 33604 Bielefeld / DE | ||
02 /
BADER, Anne Julia Euskirchener Strasse 2 50937 Koeln / DE | |||
03 /
KURSCHEID, Boris Stralsunder Strasse 21 51145 Koeln / DE | |||
04 /
IGNATYEV, Nikolai (Mykola) Prinzenstrasse 104 47058 Duisburg / DE | |||
05 /
AUST, Emil Ferdinand Am Jungstueck 15 55130 Mainz / DE | |||
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
HOGE, Berthold Kreuzstrasse 122 50354 Huerth / DE | ||
02 /
BADER, Anne Julia Euskirchener Strasse 2 50937 Koeln / DE | |||
03 /
KURSCHEID, Boris Stralsunder Strasse 21 51145 Koeln / DE | |||
04 /
IGNATYEV, Nikolai (Mykola) Prinzenstrasse 104 47058 Duisburg / DE | |||
05 /
AUST, Emil Ferdinand Am Jungstueck 15 55130 Mainz / DE | Application number, filing date | 09777109.1 | 10.07.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009EP05025 | Priority number, date | EP20080013426 | 25.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08013426 | [2011/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010009818 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2303902 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2303902 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/46 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
C07F9/65688 (EP,US);
C07F15/0066 (EP,US);
C07F15/0093 (EP,US);
C07F17/02 (EP,US);
C07F9/46 (EP,US);
C07F9/5022 (EP,US);
C07F9/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | BIS(PERFLUORALKYL)PHOSPHINIGE SÄUREN UND DERIVATE SOWIE DEREN ANWENDUNG | [2011/14] | English: | BIS(PERFLUORALKYL)PHOSPHINOUS ACIDS AND DERIVATES AND USE THEREOF | [2011/14] | French: | ACIDES BIS(PERFLUOROALKYL)PHOSPHINEUX ET DÉRIVÉS AINSI QUE LEUR UTILISATION | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 12.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2009 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | HR | 21.08.2013 | IT | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MK | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | SM | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | NO | 21.11.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 10.07.2009 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 10.07.2009 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 21.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2110767 (HOECHST AG) [X] 1 * Bis- (perfluoroalkyl)- phosphorjodide der Formel Rf2PI mit Rf = C4-C24-Perfluoralkyl; page 1; examples 1,3-8; table 3; compounds 14,15 ** Bis- (perfluoroalkyl)- phosphinigsäuren der Formel II mit Rf = C4-C24-Perfluoralkyl *; | [X] - CODELL, M., "Hydrolysis of heptafluoropropylphosphonous diiodide and bisheptafluoropropylphosphinous iodide. Formation of bisheptafluoropropylphospine", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING DATA, (1963), vol. 8, no. 3, page 460, XP002546060 [X] 1 * Bis-heptafluorpropyl-dimethylamino-phosphin, Bis-heptafluorpropyl--phosphin,;; table 1 * | [X] - EMELEUS, SMITH, "The Heptafluorpropylphosphines and their Derivates", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1959), pages 375 - 381, XP002546061 [X] 1 * page 379 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/jr9590000375 | [X] - ANG, H. ET AL., "Cyclic Phosphines and Arsines", AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (1972), vol. 25, pages 493 - 498, XP009122722 [X] 1 * Iodobis(pentafluoroethyl)phosphin, Chlorobis(pentafluoroethyl)phosphin; page 494 * | Examination | - BERTHOLD HOGE ET AL, "The Bis(pentafluoroethyl)phosphinous Acid (C 2 F 5 ) 2 POH", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (20090323), vol. 15, no. 14, doi:10.1002/chem.200801837, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 3567 - 3576, XP055025196 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.200801837 | by applicant | DE2110767 | WO03087113 | - W.MAHLER, INORG. CHEM., (1963), vol. 2, page 230 | - D.D. MAGNELLI; G. TESI; J.U. LOWE; W.E. MCQUISTION, INORG. CHEM., (1966), vol. 5, pages 457 - 461 | - L.M. YAGUPOLSKII; N.V. PAVLENKO; N.V. IGNATIEV; G.I. MATUSCHECHEVA; V.YA. SEMENII, ZH. OBSH. KHIM. (RUSS., (1984), vol. 54, no. 2, pages 334 - 339 | - J. KRÄMER ET AL., "Ionische Flüssigkeiten als Templat für Nanosynthesen", GIT LABOR-FACHZEITSCHRIFT, NR. 4, (2008), pages 400 - 403 | - E. REDEL ET AL., "First Correlation of Nanoparticles Size-Dependent Formation with lonic Liquid Anion Molecular Volume", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 47, pages 14 - 16 |