EP2329294 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN OBJECT POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss AG Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss AG Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVAREZ DIEZ, Cristina Eichendorffstrasse 12 73431 Aalen / DE | 02 /
HÖLLER, Frank Milanweg 25 73434 Aalen / DE | 03 /
SPRUCK, Bernd Lehrer-Lipp-Str. 9 73563 Moegglingen / DE | 04 /
TREMONT, Marc Scheffelweg 8 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Sticht, Andreas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/40] |
Former [2011/23] | Sticht, Andreas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09778055.5 | 22.08.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009EP06106 | Priority number, date | DE20081045386 | 02.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008045386 | [2011/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010025845 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2329294 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2329294 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/10, G01S5/16, G01S7/486, // G01S13/46 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
G01S5/16 (EP,US);
G01B11/14 (US);
G01S17/10 (EP,US);
G01S7/486 (EP,US);
G01S2013/466 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | G01S17/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER OBJEKTPOSITION | [2011/23] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN OBJECT POSITION | [2011/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA POSITION D'UN OBJET | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 11.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2009 | BG | 01.10.2014 | CY | 01.10.2014 | CZ | 01.10.2014 | DK | 01.10.2014 | EE | 01.10.2014 | ES | 01.10.2014 | FI | 01.10.2014 | HR | 01.10.2014 | IT | 01.10.2014 | LT | 01.10.2014 | LV | 01.10.2014 | MC | 01.10.2014 | MK | 01.10.2014 | MT | 01.10.2014 | NL | 01.10.2014 | PL | 01.10.2014 | RO | 01.10.2014 | SE | 01.10.2014 | SI | 01.10.2014 | SK | 01.10.2014 | SM | 01.10.2014 | TR | 01.10.2014 | NO | 01.01.2015 | GR | 02.01.2015 | IS | 01.02.2015 | PT | 02.02.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 22.08.2009 | |
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
SM | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 01.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4818100 (BREEN MICHAEL T [US]) [X] 1-2,4,8,18,20-21,23-25,28-30,40 * abstract * * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 60 *[I] 3,5-7,9-11,17,19,26-27,31-32,37-39; | [XI]US4856893 (BREEN MICHAEL T [US]) [X] 1-2,4,8,12-16,18,20-21,23-25,28-30,33,36,40 * abstract * * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 58 * * column 5, line 40 - line 44 * * column 6, line 51 - line 59 * [I] 3,5-7,9-11,17,19,26-27,31-32,34,37-39 | Examination | US5793483 | by applicant | US4818100 | US4856893 | US5793483 | DE10118392 | - K. MINOSHIMA; H. MATSUMOTO, "High-accuracy measurement of 240-m distance in an optical tunnel by use of a compact femtosecond laser", APPLIED OPTICS, (2000), vol. 39, no. 30, pages 5512 - 5517, XP002629818 |