EP2473879 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE SHARPNESS OF A FIXED-FOCUS CAMERA, TEST DEVICE FOR TESTING THE SHARPNESS OF A FIXED-FOCUS CAMERA, FIXED-FOCUS CAMERA AS WELL AS METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A FIXED-FOCUS CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HI-KEY Limited IDA Industrial Estate Dunmore Road Tuam County Galway / IE | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENNY, Patrick, Eogham 109 Ros Caoin Roscam Galway County Galway / IE | 02 /
LYONS, Pat 14 The Orchard Moylough County Galway / IE | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Jauregui Urbahn, Kristian Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH CDA-IP Laiernstrasse 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2012/28] | Application number, filing date | 09778215.5 | 31.08.2009 | WO2009EP06286 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011023214 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2473879 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03B3/00, H04N5/232 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
G03B3/00 (EP,US);
H04N17/002 (EP,US);
H04N23/67 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DEFINITION DER SCHÄRFE EINER FIXFOKUSKAMERA, TESTVORRICHTUNG ZUM TESTEN DER SCHÄRFE EINER FIXFOKUSKAMERA, FIXFOKUSKAMERA SOWIE VERFAHRE ZUR MONTAGE EINER FIXFOKUSKAMERA | [2012/28] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE SHARPNESS OF A FIXED-FOCUS CAMERA, TEST DEVICE FOR TESTING THE SHARPNESS OF A FIXED-FOCUS CAMERA, FIXED-FOCUS CAMERA AS WELL AS METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A FIXED-FOCUS CAMERA | [2012/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTERMINATION DE LA NETTETÉ D'UN APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE À FOCALISATION FIXE, DISPOSITIF DE TEST POUR TESTER LA NETTETÉ D'UN APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE À FOCALISATION FIXE, APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE À FOCALISATION FIXE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE À FOCALISATION FIXE | [2012/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 22.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 05.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB1167240 (SCHNEIDER CO OPTISCHE WERKE [DE]) [AD] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]JPS57208518 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 11,12 * abstract *; | [A]US2004057130 (KATZMAN STEVEN A [US]) [A] 12,13 * paragraph [0032] *; | [XI]JP2004309644 (OLYMPUS CORP) [X] 1-7,11 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * [I] 8-10; | [A]US6937284 (SINGH HARJIT [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 9 - line 24 *; | [A]US2006203875 (FRENZEL HENRYK [DE], et al) [A] 14,15 * page 11 *; | [X]WO2007023052 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 12-15 * page 1, line 15 - line 17 * * page 10, line 1 - line 14 *; | [A]JP2007193124 (TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TEC) [A] 12,13 * abstract *; | [A]US2007189765 (SCHULTE MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 12,13 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 31] , [0 32] , [0 36] *; | [A]WO2008081903 (KYOCERA CORP [JP], et al) [A] 12,13 * abstract ** figure 9 * |