EP2324447 - DATA CARRIER HAVING A DISPLAY FOR DISPLAYING DIFFERENT TYPES OF TRANSACTION DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CINKLER, Kalman Ackermannstrasse 7 80797 München / DE | 02 /
STOCKER, Thomas Rudolf-Zorn-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2011/21] | Application number, filing date | 09778348.4 | 04.09.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009EP06451 | Priority number, date | DE20081046129 | 05.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008046129 | [2011/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010025941 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2324447 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2324447 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
G06K19/077 (EP);
G06K19/07703 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2011/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENTRÄGER MIT DISPLAY ZUR ANZEIGE VERSCHIEDENER ARTEN VON TRANSAKTIONSDATEN | [2011/21] | English: | DATA CARRIER HAVING A DISPLAY FOR DISPLAYING DIFFERENT TYPES OF TRANSACTION DATA | [2011/21] | French: | SUPPORT DE DONNÉES PRÉSENTANT UN AFFICHAGE INDIQUANT DIFFÉRENTS TYPES DE DONNÉES DE TRANSACTION | [2011/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 09.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2009 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | CZ | 05.08.2015 | DK | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | ES | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | HR | 05.08.2015 | LT | 05.08.2015 | LV | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | MK | 05.08.2015 | MT | 05.08.2015 | NL | 05.08.2015 | PL | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | SE | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | SM | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | AT | 04.09.2015 | IE | 04.09.2015 | LU | 04.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | GB | 05.11.2015 | NO | 05.11.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | IS | 05.12.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 04.09.2009 | |
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
AT | 04.09.2015 | ||
IE | 04.09.2015 | ||
LU | 04.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 05.11.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 04.09.2009 | |
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
AT | 04.09.2015 | ||
IE | 04.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 05.11.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/17] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
AT | 04.09.2015 | ||
IE | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 05.11.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 05.11.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 05.08.2015 | |
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 05.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007250920 (LINDSAY JEFFREY DEAN [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * paragraph [0261]; figure 6 *; | [X]US5010237 (KAWANA SHIGEYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 4, line 5 - line 38; figure 6A *; | [A]US5884271 (PITRODA SATYAN G [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 14, line 19 - line 35; figures 12-14 * |