EP2396148 - DUAL ARM ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRANGÄRD, Arne Frejagatan 15A S-723 35 Västerås / SE | 02 /
KULLBORG, Camilla Lötgatan 3 S-725 91 Västerås / SE | 03 /
SIRKETT, Daniel Mälargatan 6 A S-722 10 Västerås / SE | 04 /
ANDERSSON, Hans Askö 9 S-725 91 Västerås / SE | 05 /
LUNDBERG, Ivan Blåklockevägen 91 S-722 46 Västerås / SE | 06 /
WÄPPLING, Daniel Jakobsbergsgatan 46 S-724 61 Västerås / SE | [2013/15] |
Former [2011/51] | 01 /
TRANGÄRD, Arne Frejagatan 15A S-723 35 Västerås / SE | ||
02 /
KULLBORG, Camilla Lötgatan 3 S-725 91 Västerås / SE | |||
03 /
SIRKETT, Daniel Mälargatan 6 A S-722 10 Västerås / SE | |||
04 /
ANDERSSON, Hans Askö 9 S-725 91 Västerås / SE | |||
05 /
LUNDBERG, Ivan Blåklockevägen 91 S-722 46 Västerås / SE | |||
06 /
WÄPPLING, Daniel St:a Ursulas väg 5A S-722 18 Västerås / SE | Representative(s) | Johansson Webjörn, Ingmari ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | [2013/15] |
Former [2011/51] | Johansson Webjörn, Ingmari ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 09779040.6 | 11.02.2009 | WO2009EP51551 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010091722 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2396148 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2396148 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/00, B25J9/16 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
B25J9/0087 (EP);
B25J9/009 (EP);
B25J9/1682 (EP);
G05B2219/39109 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELARMIGER ROBOTER | [2013/04] | English: | DUAL ARM ROBOT | [2011/51] | French: | ROBOT À DEUX BRAS | [2011/51] |
Former [2011/51] | ZWEIARMIGER ROBOTER | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 27.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2009 | AT | 10.04.2013 | BE | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | HR | 10.04.2013 | IT | 10.04.2013 | LT | 10.04.2013 | LV | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | MK | 10.04.2013 | MT | 10.04.2013 | NL | 10.04.2013 | PL | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | NO | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | ES | 21.07.2013 | IS | 10.08.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.02.2009 | |
AT | 10.04.2013 | ||
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
TR | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.02.2009 | |
AT | 10.04.2013 | ||
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0402599 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,9,10,13-16 * abstract * [Y] 11; | [X]JPS5964239 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,12-16 * abstract *; | [X]WO2005087451 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,13 * page 10, line 18; figure 2; claim 5 *; | [X]JPH05111897 (FANUC LTD) [X] 1,13 * abstract *; | [X]US4894901 (SODERBERG MARK S [US]) [X] 1,13 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1468791 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 11 * abstract *; | [DA]JP2003159683 (RICOH KK) [DA] 1,13 * abstract *; | [DA]US4260941 (ENGELBERGER JOSEPH F, et al) [DA] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4826392 (HAYATI SAMAD A [US]) [DA] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3932013 (BERLIN OBERBEKLEIDUNG [DD]) [DA] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [DA]JPH08185218 (NISSAN MOTOR) [DA] 1,13 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0402599 | WO2005087451 | JPS5964239 |