EP2422549 - METHOD, APPARATUS, AND RELATED COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR LOAD BALANCING IN A RELAY NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REDANA, Simone Schlierseestrasse 19 81541 Munich / DE | 02 /
RAAF, Bernhard Sebastian-Bauer-Strasse 35 81737 Munich / DE | 03 /
MICHEL, Jürgen Hadorfer Strasse 8 81475 Munich / DE | 04 /
PHAN, Vinh Van Meritullinraitti 1 B 31 FIN-90100 Oulu / FI | 05 /
TEYEB, Oumer Dannebrogsgade 50 2. th. DK-9000 Aalborg / DK | 06 /
VIERING, Ingo Werinherstrasse 95b 81541 Munich / DE | 07 /
DOETTLING, Martin Hauptstrasse 56 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 08 /
DU, Lei NSN Building A 14 Jiu Xian Qiao Road Chaoyang District Beijing 10016 / CN | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/09] | Application number, filing date | 09779350.9 | 24.04.2009 | WO2009EP54972 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010121661 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2422549 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/22, H04W16/26 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
H04W36/22 (EP,US);
H04W36/0064 (EP);
H04W36/12 (EP,US);
H04B7/2606 (EP,US);
H04W36/0055 (US);
H04W84/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND DIESBEZÜGLICHES COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUM LASTAUSGLEICH IN EINEM RELAISNETZ | [2012/09] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS, AND RELATED COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR LOAD BALANCING IN A RELAY NETWORK | [2012/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ASSOCIÉ POUR UN ÉQUILIBRAGE DE CHARGE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE RELAIS | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 19.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/49] | 20.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2007119168 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,9,21 * figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * [I] 2-8,10-20; | [X] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Measurements in support of LTE-A Techniques", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090859, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090203), no. Athens, Greece; 20090203, XP050318709 [X] 1,9,21 * the whole document * | [X] - GANG SHEN ET AL, "MS Handover Support in Transparent / Non-Transparent Relay Mode", INTERNET CITATION, (20070108), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://wirelessman.org/relay/contrib/C80216j-07_146.pdf, (20090402), XP002522417 [X] 1,9,21 * pages 1,4 - page 5 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "A discussion on some technology components for LTE-Advanced", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-082024 {LTE-ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY COMPONENTS}, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080514), vol. RAN WG1, no. Kansas City, USA; 20080514, XP050110365 [A] 1-21 * section 2.5 * |